This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 03/27/2021 at 09:02:42 (UTC).

Vons, Permissibly Self-Insured et al. v. Workers' Compensation Appeals Board

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 Vons, Permissibly Self-Insured filed an Other lawsuit against Workers' Compensation Appeals Board. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7603

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District - Division 1

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Albertson's Holdings, LLC

Vons, Permissibly Self-Insured

Respondents

Edward Vaca

Workers' Compensation Appeals Board

San Francisco, CA 94142-9459

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

John Andrew Branam

Attorney at PRINDLE, GOETZ, BARNES & REINHOL TZ LLP

10 Golden Shore, Fourth Floor

Long Beach, CA 90802

Ricardo Esteban Diaz

Attorney at Prindle, Goetz, Barnes & Reinholtz

310 Golden Shore Fl 4

Long Beach, CA 90802-4232

Respondent Attorneys

Bruce Gelber

Attorney at Fensten & Gelber

1055 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1708

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Workers' Compensation Appeals Board

P.O. Box 429459

San Francisco, CA 94142-9459

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition is denied in that there is no final order or award of the Workers' Compensation Appeals Board. (Capital Builders Hardware, Inc. v. Workers' Comp. Appeals Bd. (2016) 5 Cal.App.5th 658, 662; Maranian v. Workers' Comp. Appeals Bd. (2000) 81 Cal.App.4th 1068, 1074; Lab. Code 5900, 5901; 2 Hanna, Cal. Law of Employee Injuries and Workers' Compensation (re. 2d ed.) 34.10[2], p. 34-9.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition is denied in that there is no final order or award of the Workers' Compensation Appeals Board. (Capital Builders Hardware, Inc. v. Workers' Comp. Appeals Bd. (2016) 5 Cal.App.5th 658, 662; Maranian v. Workers' Comp. Appeals Bd. (2000) 81 Cal.App.4th 1068, 1074; Lab. Code 5900, 5901; 2 Hanna, Cal. Law of Employee Injuries and Workers' Compensation (re. 2d ed.) 34.10[2], p. 34-9.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition filed by:; Notes: Respondent Edward Vaca

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from W.C.A.B. waiving answer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Change of address filed for:; Notes: Attorney Bruce Gelber of Fensten & Gelber, for Respondent Edward Vaca.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Additional Proof of Service of Petition for Writ of Review and Appendix

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: To: All Counsel re: _______________________________________________________________________________________________ Dear Counsel: You are hereby notified that a Petition for Writ of Review has been filed in the above-entitled and numbered case on September 18, 2020. Pursuant to Rule 8.720, California Rules of Court, the Board and any respondent should file their answers within twenty-five (25) days. For further information, please contact this office.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: WCAB - Vol 1 of 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition for a writ of review filed (WCAB).; Notes: 1 Volume of Exhibits

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Albertson's Holdings LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GELBER BRUCE ESQ.