This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/02/2023 at 00:01:43 (UTC).

Visalia Unified School District v. Public Employment Relations Board

Case Summary

On 03/10/2022 Visalia Unified School District filed an Other lawsuit against Public Employment Relations Board. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4032

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Visalia Unified School District

Respondent

Public Employment Relations Board

Interested Party

California School Employees Association

Amicus Curiae

Education Legal Alliance of the California School Boards Association (CSBA)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Sochie Leiha Graham

Gabriela D. Flowers

Sloan Robert Simmons

Respondent Attorneys

Jose Felix DeLaTorre

Seth Patrick Williams

Interested Party Attorney

Alex Sasha Leenson

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Sue Ann Salmon Evans, Esq.

Ellen Carling Wu

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Response to amicus curiae brief filed by:; Notes: Respondent: Public Employment Relations Board Attorney: Jose Felix DeLaTorre by atty J Felix De La Torre/Respondent PERB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Response to amicus curiae brief filed by:; Notes: Real Party in Interest: California School Employees Association Attorney: Alex Sasha Leenson BY attu A;ex S Leenson/RPI CA School Employees Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketBrief: Response to amicus curiae brief filed by:; Party Attorney: Respondent: Public Employment Relations BoardAttorney: Jose Felix DeLaTorre; Notes: by atty J Felix De La Torre/Respondent PERB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketBrief: Response to amicus curiae brief filed by:; Party Attorney: Real Party in Interest: California School Employees AssociationAttorney: Alex Sasha Leenson; Notes: BY attu A;ex S Leenson/RPI CA School Employees Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Amicus curiae brief filed by:; Notes: Amicus curiae for petitioner: Education Legal Alliance of the California School Boards Association (CSBA) Attorney: Ellen Carling Wu Attorney: Sue Ann Salmon Evans, Esq. Attorney Salmon Evans obo amicus party Education Legal Alliance of the California School Boards Association (CSBA) for Petitioner Visalia Unified School District.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The request to file an amicus brief by Education Legal Alliance of the California School Boards Association (CSBA) on behalf of petitioner is granted. The Clerk/Executive Officer of this court is directed to file the brief contemporaneously with this order. Any party may file an answer to the amicus curiae brief filed in this case. Any answer is due 14 days from the date of this order. Hill, P. J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketBrief: Amicus curiae brief filed by:; Party Attorney: Amicus curiae for petitioner: Education Legal Alliance of the California School Boards Association (CSBA)Attorney: Ellen Carling Wu Attorney: Sue Ann Salmon Evans, Esq.; Notes: Attorney Salmon Evans obo amicus party Education Legal Alliance of the California School Boards Association (CSBA) for Petitioner Visalia Unified School District.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Application to file amicus curiae brief filed by:; Notes: Attorney Salmon Evans obo amicus party Education Legal Alliance of the California School Boards Association (CSBA) for Petitioner Visalia Unified School District.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Note:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certified record from board filed.; Notes: Vols 1-12 3589 pages. Pursuant to the Briefing Order issued March 14, 2022 Petitioner's Opening Brief is due 35 days from today on 06/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: letter and declaration with proof of service re: Certified Record by the Public Employment Relations Board.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: By PERB. 1st reqeust granted to 5/3/22. (approved by the court in a separate order )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: On March 10, 2022, this court filed a petition for writ of review from a February 7, 2022, decision of the Public Employment Relations Board (PERB). Pursuant to Fifth District Court of Appeal, Local Rules of Court, rule 8(g), the petition appears to have been timely transmitted for filing electronically on March 9, 2022. PERB's "Application for Extension of Time to File Certified Administrative Record," filed on March 14, 2022, is granted. PERB shall file with this court a certified record of its proceedings no later than May 3, 2022. (Gov. Code, 3509.5, subd. (b); Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.728(b).) Petitioner is directed to serve and file an opening brief within 35 days from the filing of the certified record. Respondent PERB shall, and any real party in interest may, serve and file a response within 35 days after petitioner's opening brief is filed. Petitioner may file a reply within 25 days from the filing of PERB's or real party in interest's response, whichever occurs last. Petitioner's request for stay, incorporated in the petition, is denied without prejudice in light of PERB's "Opposition to Request for Stay," filed on March 11, 2022, assuring this court it would not seek to enforce its order during the pendency of the writ proceedings. Hill, P. J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition - opposition to petition; Notes: by counsel for Respondent Public Emplyment Relations Board

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: This case was submitted to True Filing on 3/9/22 at 5:07 pm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for writ of review filed (PERB).; Notes: transmitted for filing electronically on March 9, 2022 by counsel for Visalia Unifid School District with request for stay of February 7, 2022 published Decision No. 2806 in Unfair Practice Charge Case No. SA-CE-2979-E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Writ Info Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exempt filing fee.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less