This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/28/2022 at 01:04:07 (UTC).

Vinnard v. County of Solano et al.

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 Vinnard filed an Other lawsuit against County of Solano. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5174

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Joyce Vinnard

Respondents and Defendants

County of Solano

State of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Adina Aspen Ostoia

Attorney at KJ Injury & Accident Lawyers, P.C.

P.O. Box 641249

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Steven Richard Weinmann

Attorney at California Department of Justice

1515 Clay Street 20Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.100(c); Disposition Type: Final Appellant has failed to pay the statutory filing fee in compliance with rule 8.100(b)(1) of the California Rules of Court and was given notice pursuant to rule 8.100(c)(1), on May 12, 2022. Appellant has also failed to file a Civil Case Information Statement in compliance with rule 8.100(g)(1) of the California Rules of Court and was given notice pursuant to rule 8.100(g)(2), on June 3, 2022. The appeal filed on May 2, 2022, is dismissed pursuant to California Rules of Court, rules 8.100(c)(3) and 8.100(g)(2).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Appellant has failed to pay the statutory filing fee in compliance with rule 8.100(b)(1) of the California Rules of Court and was given notice pursuant to rule 8.100(c)(1), on May 12, 2022. Appellant has also failed to file a Civil Case Information Statement in compliance with rule 8.100(g)(1) of the California Rules of Court and was given notice pursuant to rule 8.100(g)(2), on June 3, 2022. The appeal filed on May 2, 2022, is dismissed pursuant to California Rules of Court, rules 8.100(c)(3) and 8.100(g)(2).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: due 06/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed.; Notes: due 06/20/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: dismissal order in prep

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Counsel for appellant, re: Today, the default notice of the Civil Case Information Statement issued and was served via TrueFiling. You have 15 days from today to cure the default or the case may be dismissed. Appellant is also in default for failure to pay this court's filing fee of $775.00. The default notice issued on May 12, 2022, and was to be cured on or before June 1, 2022. Within 7 days from the date of this email the filing fee must be paid or a request to waive court fees must filed. Failure to act within this time will result in the preparation of the dismissal order pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.100(c), and sent to the court for approval to issue.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 05/02/2022 by Counsel for Plaintiff Joyce Vinnard appealing judgment from 03/26/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Solano County Superior Court - Main; County: Solano; Trial Court Case Number: FCS057282

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where County of Solano is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE OF CALIFORNA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEINMANN, STEVEN R