This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/07/2023 at 08:05:22 (UTC).

Vincent Shack v. NBC Universal Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 02/24/2022 Vincent Shack filed an Other lawsuit against NBC Universal Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Klatchko, Kira. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8607

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Klatchko, Kira

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Vincent W. Shack

Desert Hot Springs, CA 92240

Defendants and Respondents

NBC Universal Inc.

Samsung Electronics America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Wayne Howard Hammack

Attorney at P.K. Schrieffer LLP

100 N. Barranca Avenue, Suite 1100

West Covina, CA 91791

Paul K. Schrieffer

Attorney at P.K. Schrieffer, LLP

100 North Barranca Street, Suite 1100

West Covina, CA 91791

Lawrence Robert Ramsey

Attorney at Bowman and Brooke LLP

970 West 190Th Street, Suite 700

Torrance, CA 90502

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed:; Notes: Respondent NBC Universal Media's sur-reply brief per order of Dec 8, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Respondent's Nov 30, 2022 application for leave to file a sur-reply brief is granted. The clerk is directed to file the proposed sur-reply brief submitted with the application.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Application for leave to file sur-reply brief and proposed brief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Respondent NBC Universal's proposed sur-reply brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed:; Notes: Respondent NBC Universal's application for leave to file sur-reply brief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Vincent W. Shack Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Vincent W. ShackPro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: ARB; pagination is incorrect

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: No further extensions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Mar 11, 2022; 2nd

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Mar 7, 2022; NBC Universal Media, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Rqst to waive fees; duplicate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: Appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: 2nd noa dtd Mar 4, 2022; Vincent Shack

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Feb 24, 2022; Vincent W. Shack

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: INC083821; Trial Court Judge: Klatchko, Kira

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NBC UNIVERSAL THEME PARK is a litigant

Latest cases where Samsung Electronics America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAMMACK WAYNE HOWARD

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAMSEY LAWRENCE R. ESQ.