This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/29/2021 at 03:44:45 (UTC).

Video Symphony, LLC v. Hunter

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 Video Symphony, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Hunter. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kralik, John. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4260

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Kralik, John

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Video Symphony, LLC

Defendant and Respondent

Daniel Hunter

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Gerard Flanagan

Attorney at Debt Enforcement Law Group

32932 Pacific Coast Hwy #14-384

Dana Point, CA 92629

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

Aidan Woodward Butler

3550 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1924

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated July 30, 2021: 8.122 no RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Submitted by appellant with its civil case information statement.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Video Symphony, LLC Attorney: Michael Gerard Flanagan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 Filing Fee Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Video Symphony, LLCAttorney: Michael Gerard Flanagan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on July 22, 2021 by Video Symphony, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 18BBCV00240; Trial Court Judge: Kralik, John

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VIDEO SYMPHONY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUTLER AIDAN W.