This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/27/2023 at 00:06:01 (UTC).

VFLA Eventco, LLC v. William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/07/2022 VFLA Eventco, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 8 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Epstein, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3977

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Epstein, Mark

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

VFLA Eventco, LLC

Respondents and Defendants

William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC

Big Grrrl Big Touring, Inc.

Starry Us Touring Inc.

Kali Uchis Touring, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Harvey W. Geller

Steven Bennett Weisburd

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Susan Kay Leader

Dylan Grace Savage

Conor Denali Tucker

Stephanie Victoria Balitzer

Avery D Medjuck

Julian S Brod

Cynthia S Arato

Robert S Meloni

Max J. Sprecher

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's reply brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Appellant's reply brief. Due on 06/26/2023 By 61 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation filed to:; Notes: Extend due date of ARB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Big Grrrl Big Touring, Inc. Attorney: Avery D Medjuck Defendant and Respondent: Starry Us Touring Inc. Defendant and Respondent: Kali Uchis Touring, Inc. One extension granted for a total of 30 days: 02/21/2023 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 04/06/2023 By 30 Day(s) 02/23/2023 Granted - extension of time. Due on 04/06/2023 By 30 Day(s

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC Attorney: Conor Denali Tucker Two extensions granted for a total of 90 days: 12/21/2022 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 03/07/2023 By 60 Day(s) 02/21/2023 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 04/06/2023 By 30 Day(s) 02/21/2023 Granted - extension of time. Due on 04/06/2023 By 30 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Due Date: 06/26/2023; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: VFLA Eventco, LLCAttorney: Harvey W. Geller Attorney: Steven Bennett Weisburd

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Big Grrrl Big Touring, Inc.Attorney: Avery D Medjuck Defendant and Respondent: Starry Us Touring Inc. Defendant and Respondent: Kali Uchis Touring, Inc.; Notes: One extension granted for a total of 30 days: 02/21/2023 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 04/06/2023 By 30 Day(s) 02/23/2023 Granted - extension of time. Due on 04/06/2023 By 30 Day(s

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLCAttorney: Conor Denali Tucker; Notes: Two extensions granted for a total of 90 days: 12/21/2022 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 03/07/2023 By 60 Day(s) 02/21/2023 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 04/06/2023 By 30 Day(s) 02/21/2023 Granted - extension of time. Due on 04/06/2023 By 30 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: pro hac vice granted; Notes: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ROBERT S. MELONI TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL FOR RESPONDENTS STARRY US TOURING INC. AND KALI UCHIS TOURING INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: pro hac vice granted; Notes: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF AVERY MEDJUCK TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL FOR BIG GRRRL BIG TOURING, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: APPELLANT'S APPENDIX Volume 1 of 9 - Pages AA0001 to AA0986 of AA8752

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: VFLA Eventco, LLCAttorney: Harvey W. Geller

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: VFLA Eventco, LLC Attorney: Harvey W. Geller Attorney: Steven Bennett Weisburd

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: VFLA Eventco, LLCAttorney: Harvey W. Geller Attorney: Steven Bennett Weisburd

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Reporter's transcript submitted to Court of Appeal on October 20, 2022 is being returned due to the reporter's transcript must be submitted to the Civil Appeals Unit (LASC), per the designation of record.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil filing fee paid via credit card for VFLA Eventco, LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on October 07, 2022 by VFLA Eventco, LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20SMCV00933; Trial Court Judge: Epstein, Mark

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less