This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 02/23/2022 at 14:12:56 (UTC).

Veronese v. Superior Court Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 Veronese filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 7 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mooney, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4678

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mooney, Mark

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Bonnie Veronese

Respondents

Superior Court Los Angeles County

Hon. Mark Mooney

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Parties

Nexo Insurance Service, Inc.

Eric Reingen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Craig Trent Byrnes

Attorney at Law Offices of Craig T. Byrnes

1500 Rosecrans Ave. Suite 500

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorney

Laurie DeYoung

Attorney at Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani

633 W 5Th St Fl 52

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed on August 31, 2021. The petition is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed on August 31, 2021. The petition is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Transcript of August 12, 2021 proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Trancript of proceedings.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume 1 of 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate with a STAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nexo Insurance Service, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEYOUNG LAURIE