This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 04/14/2023 at 18:03:26 (UTC).

Ventura County Human Services Agency v. N.R. et al.**366.26**

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 Ventura County Human Services Agency filed an Other lawsuit against N R 366 26. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cody, Tari. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4913

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Cody, Tari

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Ventura County Human Services Agency

Appellants

N. R.

C. G.

Not Yet Classified and Appellants

S. R.

C. G.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of the County Counsel

Appellant Attorneys

California Appellate Project

Jacques Alexander Love

Christopher R. Booth

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Thomas Alan Young

 

Court Documents

B314913

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in full; Disposition Type: Final AFF/8 pages/YGP; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Yegan, Kenneth R.; Participants: Perren, Steven Z. (Concur) Gilbert, Arthur (Concur)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) AFF/8 pages/YGPThe orders denying father's section 388 petition and terminating parental rights as to both father and mother are affirmed. Mother's appeal as to C.G. is dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Argument waived, cause submitted.; Notes: Thursday, May 12, 2022 at 1:30 pm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Waiver of oral argument filed by:; Notes: Attorney Chris Booth for appellant / WAIVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Waiver of oral argument filed by:; Notes: Atty J. Love for aplt. / WAIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Waiver of oral argument filed by:; Notes: Joseph Randazzo for respondent / WAIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent. Calendar date:; Notes: Thursday, May 12, 2022 at 1:30 pm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketBrief: Suspend briefing.; Party Attorney: Appellant: N. R.Attorney: Jacques Alexander Love Appellant: C. G.Attorney: California Appellate Project

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.; Notes: As to mother's two notices filed 10-13-2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: N/A filed 10-13-2021 by MOTHER as to minor C.G. / J072244

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: N/A filed 10-13-2021 by MOTHER as to minor S.R. / J072753

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Attorney Jack Love on behalf of appellant (AOB + 30)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-2 (392) Conf. C-1 (10) Digital R-6 (124)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: ********FAST TRACK APPEAL********

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: N/A dtd 9-9-21 by aplt. N.R. (father); from 8-23-21 Denial of JV-180 & 8-26-21 termination of parental rights (Juv. Case no. J072753)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Ventura County Superior Court - Main (Ventura); County: Ventura; Trial Court Case Number: J072753; Trial Court Judge: Cody, Tari

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less