This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/18/2023 at 04:09:18 (UTC).

Ventura County Human Services Agency v. M.S. **FAST TRACK**

Case Summary

On 01/05/2023 Ventura County Human Services Agency filed an Other lawsuit against M S FAST TRACK. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Covarrubias, Manuel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5408

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Covarrubias, Manuel

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Ventura County Human Services Agency

Defendant and Appellant

M. S.

Not Yet Classified

J. N.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of the County Counsel

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

California Appellate Project

Konrad S. Lee

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Amanda Grace Sanderson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2023
  • HearingDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: **FAST Track**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: M. S. Attorney: Konrad S. Lee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 06/02/2023; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Ventura County Human Services AgencyAttorney: Office of the County Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: M. S.Attorney: Konrad S. Lee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 04/28/2023 By 30 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 04/28/2023 By 30 Day(s) 4/28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Konrad Lee for appellant (AOB + 30)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: RT-6 (81), CT-2 (495), Confidential CT-1 (9)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: ********FAST TRACK APPEAL********

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: N/A dtd 1-5-23 from 11-10-22 order terminating parental rights by M.S. (Mother)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Ventura County Superior Court - Main (Ventura); County: Ventura; Trial Court Case Number: J072946; Trial Court Judge: Covarrubias, Manuel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less