This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 04/13/2022 at 07:23:14 (UTC).

VELIS v. AT&T SERVICES

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 VELIS filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against AT T SERVICES. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0100

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

William Velis

Defendant and Respondent

AT&T Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Larry W. Lee

Attorney at Diversity Law Group, P.C.

515 South Figueroa Street, Suite 1250

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3316

Edward W. Choi

Attorney at Law Offices of Choi & Associates

515 South Figueroa Street, Suite1250

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Dennis S. Hyun

Attorney at Hyun Legal, APC

515 South Figueroa Street, Suite 1250

Los Angeles, CA 90071

William L. Marder

Attorney at Polaris Law Group LLP

501 San Benito Street, #200

Hollister, CA 95023

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

James Paul De Haan

Attorney at Paul Hastings LLP

4747 Executive Drive, Floor 12

San Diego, CA 92121-3114

Raymond William Bertrand

Attorney at Paul Hastings LLP

4747 Executive Drive, 12Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92121

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including October 26, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: William Velis Attorney: Larry W. Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: AT&T Services, Inc. Attorney: Raymond William Bertrand

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record has been imported and is available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: William Velis Attorney: Larry W. Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 4; Court of Appeal Case Number: B303011; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV10231

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AT&T Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Paul De Haan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERTRAND RAYMOND