This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/16/2023 at 14:03:02 (UTC).

VELASQUEZ v. NORTHGATE GONZALEZ MARKETS

Case Summary

On 10/14/2022 VELASQUEZ filed an Other lawsuit against NORTHGATE GONZALEZ MARKETS. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6503

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Yadira Velasquez

Defendants and Appellants

Northgate Gonzalez Markets, Inc.

Northgate Gonzalez, Inc.

Jose Garcia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Kaveh Sam Elihu

Attorney at Employee Justice Legal Group, PC

1001 Wilshire Blvd,

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Dawn Ly

Attorney at EMPLOYEE JUSTICE LEGAL GROUP PC

1001 Wilshire Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Sylvia V. Panosian

Attorney at Employee Justice Legal Group, LLP.

1001 Wilshire Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Corinne D. Spencer

Attorney at Pearlman Brown & Wax

15910 Ventura Blvd Fl 18

Encino, CA 91436-2819

Antwoin Dion Wall

Attorney at Pearlman Brown & Wax

15910 Ventura Blvd. 18Th Floor

Encino, CA 91436-2819

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Publication request denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Publication request denied (case closed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case start date (publication request)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (initial case entry); Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Northgate Gonzalez Markets, Inc. Attorney: Corinne D. Spencer Defendant and Appellant: Jose Garcia Attorney: Corinne D. Spencer The request for publication has been considered and is denied for the reason that the Court of Appeal does not find said opinion meets the criteria for publication as set forth in rule 8.1105(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 2; Court of Appeal Case Number: B309831; Disposition: Reversed & Remanded to trial court w/directions; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV28061

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Northgate Gonzalez Markets, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where NORTHGATE GONZALEZ LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALL ANTWOIN DION

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPENCER CORINNE DIONELA