This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/15/2022 at 02:05:58 (UTC).

Vascos Excavation Group, LLC v. Gold

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 Vascos Excavation Group, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Gold. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Dillon, Timothy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5205

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Dillon, Timothy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Vascos Excavation Group, LLC

Respondent and Defendant

Robert Gold

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Daniel O'Leary

Attorney at Law Offices of Daniel M O'Leary

2300 Westwood Blvd. Suite 105

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Catherine Ripolone Finamore

6454 Coldwater Canyon

North Hollywood, CA 91606

Bruce Rudman

Attorney at Abdulaziz Grossbart & Rudman

6454 Coldwater Canyon Avenue

North Hollywood, CA 91606

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Sept. 10, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Vascos Excavation Group, LLC Attorney: Daniel O'Leary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 Filing Fee Paid.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Due Date: 02/22/2022; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Vascos Excavation Group, LLCAttorney: Daniel O'Leary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Vascos Excavation Group, LLCAttorney: Daniel O'Leary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on September 1, 2021 by Vascos Excavation Group, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV01372; Trial Court Judge: Dillon, Timothy

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FINAMORE CATHERINE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUDMAN BRUCE D. ESQ.