This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/05/2022 at 03:02:56 (UTC).

Varuna Entertainment, Inc. et al. v. Ball

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 Varuna Entertainment, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Ball. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mooney, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4915

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mooney, Mark

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Varuna Entertainment, Inc.

Ali Bazzy

Defendants and Respondents

Prema Ball

Kick Punch Ent.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

William B. DeClercq

Attorney at DECLERCQ LAW GROUP INC

445 S Figueroa Street Suite 3100

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1635

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Joel M. Tantalo

Attorney at Tantalo & Adler LLP

1801 Century Park East, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90067-6012

David Charles Bolstad

Attorney at Safarian, Choi & Bolstad, LLP

555 S. Flower St., Suite 650

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Christopher Alan Johnson

Attorney at Safarian Choi & Bolstad

555 South Flower St. Suite 650

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jonathan Blake Gaskin

Attorney at Kaufhold Gaskin LLP

388 Market St Ste 1300

San Francisco, CA 94111

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Amended Designation dated May 25, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Appellants' notice of filing amended notice designating record on appeal (documents attached)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Attorney William B DeClercq of DeClercq Law Group, Inc substitutes in as counsel of record for appellant Ali Bazzy in place and instead of William B DeClercq of Taylor English Duma LLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Attorney William B DeClercq of DeClercq Law Group, Inc substitutes in as counsel of record for appellant Varuna Entertainment, Inc in place and instead of William B DeClercq of Taylor English Duma LLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Good cause appearing, appellant's Motion to augment the record treated as motion for leave to file an amended designation of record for the appeal filed August 20, 2021 is granted. Appellant shall file an amended designation of record on appeal with the clerk of the Superior Court within 15 days from the date of this order. All acts (except for payment of fees) in compliance with this relief order is to be submitted via the Los Angeles County Superior Court's electronic filing service provider. Payment of fees must be made at Room 111-A at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, California. Self-represented parties are not required to electronically file and may comply with this order at 111 North Hill Street, Room 111-A, Los Angeles, California. If appellant fails to file an amended designation in a timely manner, the Clerk of the Superior Court shall immediately proceed with the original designation of record filed by appellant. If default is not cured in a timely manner, the appeal will be dismissed without further notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Motion to Augment the Record on Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice received-appellant notified per rule 8.140(a)(1).; Notes: clerk's notice of non-compliance of default on appeal, dated 2/22/2022; On appellant's notice designating record, section 5(b)(1) - the date of 6/24/21 was not a hearing date - it was the date the order was signed. The correct hearing date is 6/23/21 - appellant will need to properly amend or augment the record for date requested.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellants' motion to augment submitted on Jan 31, 2022 via truefiling has been rejected. Incomplete Proof of Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellant's request for extension to file opening brief submitted Dec 20, 2021 via truefiling has been rejected. A deadline for the opening brief has not been set. Please see California Rules of Court, rule 8.212(a) for more information.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Varuna Entertainment, Inc. Attorney: William B. DeClercq Plaintiff and Appellant: Ali Bazzy Attorney: William B. DeClercq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Varuna Entertainment, Inc.Attorney: William B. DeClercq Plaintiff and Appellant: Ali BazzyAttorney: William B. DeClercq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Aug. 30, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: appeal filing fee: check# D4024476 for $775.00 (InfoTrack US, Inc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee receivedFee was paid on 9/10 via check, vacated notice sent via email

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on 8/20/2021 by Varuna Entertainment, Inc. et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV27364; Trial Court Judge: Mooney, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VARUNA ENTERTAINMENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GASKIN, JONATHAN B

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Alan Johnson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TANTALO JOEL M.