This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 10/27/2022 at 11:29:52 (UTC).

VANKLIVE v. S.C. (JOHNSON & JOHNSON)

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 VANKLIVE filed an Other lawsuit against C JOHNSON JOHNSON. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6608

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Nedelka Vanklive

Respondent

Superior Court of Alameda County

Interested Parties

Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC

Soco West, Inc.

Western Chem & MFG Co

Cyprus Mines Corporation

Johnson & Johnson Cons Companies

Johnson & Johnson

A. J. Lynch & Co.

Johnson & Johnson International

The Vons Companies, Inc.

R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc.

Safeway, Inc.

Whitaker, Clark, Daniels, Inc.

Pfizer, Inc.

Designated Defense Counsel

Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Denyse F. Clancy

Joseph D. Satterley

Brian Patrick Barrow

Ian Wilfred A. Rivamonte

Interested Party Attorneys

Robert Dirk Bernhardt

William Henry Armstrong

Reynold Montague Martinez

Jennifer J. Lee

Natalie Garcia Lashinsky

Paul R. Johnson

Alexander G. Calfo

Susan V. Vargas

Gabrielle Jaynea Anderson-Thompson

Farah A. Ballout

Jason Alan Kort

Ferlin Peregrino Ruiz

Laura Przetak

Evanthia M. Spanos

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest: Johnson & Johnson Attorney: Paul R. Johnson Real Party in Interest: Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. Attorney: Paul R. Johnson Real Party in Interest: Johnson & Johnson International Attorney: Paul R. Johnson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Petitioner: Nedelka Vanklive Attorney: Brian Patrick Barrow Attorney: Ian Wilfred A. Rivamonte

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest: Johnson & Johnson Attorney: Paul R. Johnson Real Party in Interest: Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. Attorney: Paul R. Johnson Real Party in Interest: Johnson & Johnson International Attorney: Paul R. Johnson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: First Appellate District , Div. 2; Court of Appeal Case Number: A161572; Disposition: Petition granted by opinion; Trial Court: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: RG20062734

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less