This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 04/27/2021 at 06:19:33 (UTC).

Valerie F. Horn & Associates et al. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 Valerie F Horn Associates filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fruin, Jr., Richard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8422

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Fruin, Jr., Richard

 

Party Details

Interested Parties and Petitioners

Valerie F. Horn

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Valerie F. Horn & Associates

Steven J. Horn

James Rishel

Marlene Harrison

Mohammed Naraghi

Lev Berkovich

Dolores Horn

Izrail Zaslavsky

Neil Elan

Lindbrook Homeowners Association

Ross Morgan & Company, Inc.

Alla Berkovich

Law Offices of Steven J. Horn

Antonio Vaziri

Respondents

Hon. Richard L. Fruin

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Douglas Alan Pettit

Attorney at Pettit Kohn Ingrassia Lutz & Dolin PC

11622 El Camino Real Ste 300

San Diego, CA 92130

Jennifer Patrice Suberlak

Attorney at Pettit Kohn Ingrassia Lutz & Dolin PC

11622 El Camino Real Ste 300

San Diego, CA 92130-2051

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Steven Ryan Inouye

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

633 W 5Th Street 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

David L. Jones

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

633 West Fifth Street 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Matthew John Deenihan

Attorney at Stratman, Schwartz & Williams-Abrego

700 S Flower St Ste 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Simon Young Song

Attorney at Katofsky Law, LLP

4558 Sherman Oaks Ave.

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Jeff C. Katofsky

Attorney at Katofsky Law, LLP

4558 Sherman Oaks Ave. 2Nd Floor

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Michael Hayden Leff

Attorney at Katofsky Law, LLP

4558 Sherman Oaks Avenue

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Sohaila Sagheb

Attorney at Law Offices of Sohaila Sagheb

21112 Ventura Blvd.

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

Kere Kay Tickner

Attorney at Tickner McCliman, APC

30211 Avenied De Las Banderas Suite 200

Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688

Michelle Marie McCliman

Attorney at Tickner McCliman, APC

30211 Avenida De Las Bandera Ste 200

Rancho Santa Margari, CA 92688-2159

Valerie F. Horn

Attorney at Valerie F. Horn & Associates, APLC

1901 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1905

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Susan Balistocky

Attorney at Law Offices of Susan Balistocky

1901 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 200

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Steven Jeffry Horn

Attorney at Law Offices of Steven J. Horn

15760 Ventura Blvd. Suite 1520

Encino, CA 91436-3095

Paul Andrew Elkort

Attorney at Maranga Morgenstern

5850 Canoga Avenue, Suite 600

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Robert A. Morgenstern

Attorney at Maranga Morgenstern

5850 Canoga Avenue, Suite 600

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Justin Andrew Nash

Attorney at Kulik, Gottesman Siegel & Ware LLP

15303 Ventura Blvd Ste 1400

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Nicholas Max Meerson

Attorney at Kulik Gottesman Siegel & Ware LLP

15303 Ventura Blvd Ste 1400

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403-6610

Leonard Siegel

Attorney at Kulik, Gottesman, Siegel & Ware, LLP

15303 Ventura Blvd., Suite 1400

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

1 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition for writ of mandate, filed October 27, 2020; the request for judicial notice, filed October 27, 2020; the supplemental petition, filed November 25, 2020; the opposition by real parties in interest Lindbrook Homeowners Association and Ross Morgan & Company, filed January 22, 2021; the joinder filed by Lev Berkovich, filed January 22, 2021; and petitioners' reply, filed February 1, 2021, have been read and considered. The request for judicial notice is denied. The petition is denied. The temporary stay order, issued December 24, 2020, is hereby vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate, filed October 27, 2020; the request for judicial notice, filed October 27, 2020; the supplemental petition, filed November 25, 2020; the opposition by real parties in interest Lindbrook Homeowners Association and Ross Morgan & Company, filed January 22, 2021; the joinder filed by Lev Berkovich, filed January 22, 2021; and petitioners' reply, filed February 1, 2021, have been read and considered. The request for judicial notice is denied. The petition is denied. The temporary stay order, issued December 24, 2020, is hereby vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: REAL PARTIES IN INTEREST LINDBROOK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION AND ROSS MORGAN & COMPANY OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND/OR PROHIBITION OR OTHER APPROPRIATE RELIEF (by Valerie F. Horn & Associates and Valerie F. Horn).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed joinder of:; Notes: real party in interest Lev Berkovich, in arguments briefed in opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandate by co-real parties in interst Lindbrook Homeowners Associations and Ross Morgan & Company Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: by real parties in interest Lindbrook Homeowners Association and Ross Morgan & Company to Petition for Writ of Mandate.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition requested.; Notes: Opposition to the above-entitled petition by real parties in interest shall be served and filed by 10:00 a.m., on January 22, 2020. The brief may be filed electronically via the court's e-filing service provider (TrueFiling).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: counsel. There are motions, writ petitions, and appeals pending in the above referenced matters. Given the nature of the underlying disputes in these matters, it appears that this is a good time to consider discussing settlement. The court has a panel of experienced mediators and such mediations can be conducted on Zoom or a similar platform in these COVID-19 times. If the parties join in a request to participate in our court's mediation program, please let us know by completing and returning the Request for Mediation Form within 15 days of this date of this notice. The form is available at https://www.courts.ca.gov/2499.htm and the court's email address is on the form. Should you need any help or have questions, you may contact one of the clerks in Division One. If the parties reach a settlement or partial settlement, you are directed to comply with rule 8.244(a) of the California Rules of Court. Thank you for your prompt attention to this matter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Stay order filed.; Notes: TEMPORARY STAY ORDER All proceedings and discovery in Los Angeles Superior Court case No. 20STCV07536, entitled Valerie F. Horn & Associates et al. v. Lev Berkovich et al., are hereby stayed pending resolution of the above petition or further order of this Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Douglas A. Pettit, Esq. and Julia Dalzell, Esq. of Pettit Kohn Ingrassia Lutz & Dolin PC are Attorneys for Appellants/Defendants VALERIE F. HORN & ASSOCIATES, a Professional Law Corporation, and VALERIE F. HORN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Supplemental Petition (volume 9).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Supplemental Petition for Writ of Mandate (Separate Volume 9).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Amended proof of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Proposed order regarding petitioners' request for judicial notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volumes 8 of 8.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.; Notes: Request for judicial notice in support of petition for writ of mandate.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate ~ STAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LINDBROOK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION A NON-PROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where VALERIE F. HORN & ASSOCIATES is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where ROSS MORGAN AND COMPANY INC. is a litigant