This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 02/20/2022 at 23:46:14 (UTC).

VALENCIA v. BOARD OF REGISTERED NURSING

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 VALENCIA filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against BOARD OF REGISTERED NURSING. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9731

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Janet Anne Baena Valencia

Respondent and Defendant

Board of Registered Nursing

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Gary S. Garfinkle

Attorney at Garfinkle Law Office

1205 Via Gabarda

Lafayette, CA 94549

Maria J Garfinkle

Attorney at Garfinkle Law Office

1205 Via Gabarda

Lafayette, CA 94549

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Gregory M. Tuss

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue - Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102

Carla Lyn Cheung

Attorney at California Department of Justice

455 Golden Gate Ave., Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Letter from respondent Board of Registered Nursing advising that they do not intend to file an answer to petition for review, unless one is requested by the Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Notice of errata to reflect the cover page to "Petition for Review".

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Janet Anne Baena Valencia Attorney: Gary S. Garfinkle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: First Appellate District , Div. 4; Court of Appeal Case Number: A159249; Disposition: Dismissed by opinion; Trial Court: Contra Costa County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: MSN181358

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory M. Tuss