This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/26/2023 at 07:05:11 (UTC).

V Lions Farming, LLC et al. v. County of Kern et al. (CON/F084763, F085220)

Case Summary

On 10/17/2022 V Lions Farming, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against County of Kern CON/F084763, F085220. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pulskamp, Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5102

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Pulskamp, Gregory

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

V Lions Farming, LLC

Committee for a Better Arvin

Committee for a Better Shafter

Comite Progreso de Lamont

Natural Resources Defense Council

Sierra Club

Center for Biological Diversity

Respondents and Defendants

County of Kern

Kern County Board of Supervisors

Kern County Planning and Natural Resources Department

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Rachel Bentley Hooper

Attorney at Shute Mihaly & Weinberger LLP

396 Hayes St.

San Francisco, CA 94102

Daniel Isaac Ress

Attorney at Center on Race, Poverty & Environment

1012 Jefferson Street

Delano, CA 93215-2239

Caroline Farrell

Attorney at Center on Race, Poverty & Environment

1012 Jefferson Street

Delano, CA 93215

Ann Alexander

Attorney at Natural Resources Defense Council

111 Sutter St Fl 21

San Francisco, CA 94104-4540

Colin Casey O'Brien

Attorney at Earthjustice

50 California St Ste 500

San Francisco, CA 94111-4608

Gregory D. Muren

Attorney at Earthjustice

50 California St, Ste 500

San Francisco, CA 94111-4608

Hollin N. Kretzmann

Attorney at Center For Biological Diversity

1212 Broadway Ste 800

Oakland, CA 94612

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Charles Lagrange Coleman, III

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

50 California St #2800

San Francisco, CA 94111-4624

Jennifer Lynn Hernandez

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

50 California Street, 2800

San Francisco, CA 94111

Marshall S. Fontes

Attorney at Office of the County Counsel

1115 Truxtun Ave., 4Th Floor

Bakersfield, CA 93301

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2022
  • DispositionDescription: All documents refiled into different case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed order consolidating with case:; Notes: F084763: ALL FUTURE ENTRIES IN THIS CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Notice of Supersedeas Exhibits were submitted manually on a "Flash Drive" due to exhibits are too large to send electronically.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Writ Petition Information Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: to the parties listed of the following: (1) PETITION FOR WRIT OF SUPERSEDEAS OR OTHER APPROPRIATE STAY ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (2) MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION REGARDING EXHIBITS TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF SUPERSEDEAS OR OTHER APPROPRIATE STAY ORDER (3) APPELLATE COURT WRIT PETITION INFORMATION SHEET (4) EXHIBITS TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF SUPERSEDEAS OR OTHER APPROPRIATE STAY ORDER (on flash drive)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for writ of supersedeas filed.; Notes: Stay Request by Attorney O'Brien obo Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club along with Attorney Hooper obo V Lions Farming, LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Applt's Joint Motion to Consolidated Appeals...Only 1 motion needs to be filed in Lead (lowest) appellate case number.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Atty Hooper obo Applt V Lions Farming

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Atty O'Brien obo Applt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #196637 forwarded by atty O'Brien obo applt Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check # 5002111 forwarded by atty Hooper obo applt V Lions Farming, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on 10/17/22 obo of applt Committee for a Better Arvin, Committee for a Better Shafter, Comit Progreso de Lamont, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, and Center for Biological Diversity by attys Colin O'Brien, Caroline Farrell and Hollin Kretzmann. Appealing 10/4/22 Ruling on Remedies Relief (Second Modified Judgment)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on 10/17/22 obo of applt V Lions Farming, LLC by atty Rachel Hooper. Appealing 10/4/22 Ruling on Remedies Relief (Second Modified Judgment)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Kern County Superior Court - Main; County: Kern; Trial Court Case Number: BCV-15-101645-GP; Trial Court Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where V Lions Farming, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Kern County Board of Supervisors is a litigant

Latest cases where County of Kern is a litigant