This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/20/2022 at 02:24:41 (UTC).

USA TODAY v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 USA TODAY filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Penny, Brenda. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5096

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Penny, Brenda

 

Party Details

Petitioner

USA TODAY

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Brenda J. Penny

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party

Britney Jean Spears

Others

Lynne Spears

Jodi Montgomery

Pasadena, CA 91104

James P. Spears

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Christopher C. Melcher

Attorney at Walzer & Melcher LLP

5941 Variel Avenue

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorney

Mathew S Rosengart

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

1840 Century Park E Ste 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Other Attorneys

Yasha Bronshteyn

Attorney at Ginzburg & Bronshteyn, LLP

11755 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1250

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Lauriann Wright

Attorney at Wright Kim Douglas, ALC

130 S. Jackson Street

Glendale, CA 91205

Vivian Lee Thoreen

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

400 S. Hope Street 8Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jonathan Hoon Park

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

400 S. Hope Street, 8Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Roger B. Coven

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

400 S. Hope Street 8Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition filed by:; Notes: service copy - answer to petition for review filed by LASC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Supreme Court order filed re:; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including December 30, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied. [S271168]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received document entitled:; Notes: Letter addressed to CA Supreme Court re: granting petition for review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record transmitted to Supreme Court electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: S271168

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed September 17, 2021. The petition is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume 1 of 1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where USA Today is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARK JONATHAN HOON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roger B. Coven