This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/06/2023 at 18:14:33 (UTC).

U.S. BANK v. ABADI

Case Summary

On 10/03/2022 U S BANK filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against ABADI. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6710

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

U.S. Bank NA

Defendants and Appellants

David Abadi

Ofra Abadi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Gwen Heather Ribar

Attorney at Wright Finlay & Zak LLP

4665 Macarthur Court Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Lukasz Iwo Wozniak

Attorney at Wright Finlay & Zak LLP

4665 Macarthur Ct. Suite 280

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Frank A. Weiser

Attorney at Attorney at Law

3460 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 1212

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: one doghouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received additional record; Notes: One doghouse.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: David Abadi Attorney: Frank A. Weiser Defendant and Appellant: Ofra Abadi Attorney: Frank A. Weiser

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 6; Court of Appeal Case Number: B315520; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Ventura County Superior Court - Main (Ventura); Trial Court Case Number: 56-2020-00541900-CU-OR-VTA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEISER FRANK ALAN