This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 08/05/2022 at 04:04:26 (UTC).

UNITED TALENT AGENCY v. VIGILANT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/21/2022 UNITED TALENT AGENCY filed an Other lawsuit against VIGILANT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5146

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

United Talent Agency

Respondents and Defendants

Vigilant Insurance Company

Federal Insurance Company

Not Yet Classified

United Policyholders

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Kirk A. Pasich

Attorney at Pasich, LLP

10880 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Michael S. Gehrt

Attorney at Pasich, LLP

10880 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Nathan M. Davis

Attorney at Pasich, LLP

10880 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Caitlin S. Oswald

Attorney at Pasich, LLP

10880 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Susan Koehler Sullivan

Attorney at Clyde & Co US LLP

355 South Grand Avenue, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Gretchen S. Carner

Attorney at Clyde & Co US LLP

355 South Grand Avenue, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Brett C. Safford

Attorney at Clyde & Co US LLP

355 South Grand Avenue, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Douglas J. Collodel

Attorney at Clyde & Co US LLP

355 South Grand Avenue, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Jonathan D. Hacker

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

1625 I Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Brett Charles Safford

Attorney at Clyde & Co US LLP

355 South Grand Avenue, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Rani Gupta

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

3000 El Camino Real 5 Palo Alto Square

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Depublication request denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Depublication request denied (case closed); Notes: The request for an order directing depublication of the opinion in the above-entitled appeal is denied. The court declines to review this matter on its own motion. The matter is now final.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Letter dated July 13, 2022 regarding newly decided authority supporting request for depublication. United Policyholders, Pub/Depublication Requestor Rani Gupta, Retained counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition to depublication request filed; Notes: Vigilant Insurance Company, Defendant and Respondent Jonathan D. Hacker, Retained counsel. Federal Insurance Company, Defendant and Respondent Jonathan D. Hacker, Retained counsel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Time for ordering review extended on the court's own motion; Notes: The time for ordering review on the court's own motion is hereby extended to and including August 22, 2022. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.512(c).)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case start date (depublication request)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for depublication filed (initial case event); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: United Policyholders Attorney: Rani Gupta

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 4; Court of Appeal Case Number: B314242; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV43745

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Policyholders is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED TALENT AGENCY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where VIGILANT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Insurance Company is a litigant