Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 05/11/2021 at 05:03:52 (UTC).

UMPQUA Bank v. Xelan Prop 1, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 UMPQUA Bank filed an Other lawsuit against Xelan Prop 1, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Haines, Charles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2319

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Courts Of Appeal

  • Courthouse:

    First Appellate District - Division 3

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Haines, Charles

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

UMPQUA Bank

Defendant and Appellant

Xelan Prop 1, LLC

Others

Kevin Singer

Receivership Specialist, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Robert B. Kaplan

Attorney at Jeffer, Mangels, Butler & Mitchell

One Embarcadero Center, 5Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Joshua K. Haevernick

Attorney at Jeffer Mangels Butler & Mitchell LLP

2 Embarcadero Center 5Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Karen Y. Uchiyama

Attorney at Law Offices of Karen Y. Uchiyama

733 Webster Street

San Francisco, CA 94117

Other Attorney

Blake Corby Alsbrook

Attorney at Ervin Cohen & Jessup LLP

9401 Wilshire Boulevard, 9Th Floor

Beverly Hills, CA 90212-2974

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • HearingDescription: Order to show cause - court reporter or atty.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Xelan Prop 1, LLC Attorney: Karen Y. Uchiyama with order attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Xelan Prop 1, LLCAttorney: Karen Y. Uchiyama; Notes: with order attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: 4/19/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid by Law Offices of Karen Uchiyama, attorney for appellant Xelan Prop 1; check 1284

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 03/16/2021 by Counsel for Defendant Xelan Prop 1, LLC appealing order from 03/01/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CGC18564941; Trial Court Judge: Haines, Charles

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Xelan Prop 1 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Umpqua Bank is a litigant