This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 05/27/2021 at 00:01:23 (UTC).

Ultimate Action, LLC et al. v. The November First Partnership, A Dissolved California General Partnership, et al. et al.

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 Ultimate Action, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against The November First Partnership, A Dissolved California General Partnership. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Court, Michelle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8448

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Court, Michelle

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Ultimate Action, LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company

Patricia K. Schwartz

Ultimate Action, LLC

Defendants and Respondents

The November First Partnership, A Dissolved California General Partnership, et al.

Scott D. Schwartz

SJB Wilshire, LLC

Insignia PMG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Respondent, Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

L. Peter Ryan

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

345 California Street, Suite 2200

San Francisco, CA 94104-2670

Jack C Praetzellis

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

1800 Century Park East

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Dwight Craig Donovan

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

345 California St Ste 2200

San Francisco, CA 94104

Mark J. Rosenbaum

Attorney at Wolf Rifkin Shapiro Schulman & Rabkin, LLP

11400 West Olympic Blvd 9Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90064-1582

Johnny White

Attorney at Wolf, Rifkin, Shapiro, Schulman & Rabkin

11400 W Olympic Blvd 9Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Requested for 07/09/2021 By 45 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 05/25/2021 By 63 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Requested for 05/31/2021 By 69 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Ultimate Action, LLC Attorney: Johnny White Attorney: Mark J. Rosenbaum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Due Date: 05/25/2021; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Ultimate Action, LLCAttorney: Johnny White Attorney: Mark J. Rosenbaum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Ultimate Action, LLCAttorney: Johnny White Attorney: Mark J. Rosenbaum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check# 386168 for $775

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed Oct 23, 2020 by Ultimate Action, LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company Derivatively on Behalf of 357 South Broadway , a California Limited Liability Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV17040; Trial Court Judge: Court, Michelle

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE NOVEMBER FIRST PARTNERSHIP A DISSOLVED CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jack C Praetzellis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DONOVAN DWIGHT CRAIG