This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/22/2023 at 21:05:40 (UTC).

Turner v. El Camino Investment Company, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 Turner filed an Other lawsuit against El Camino Investment Company, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Levanas, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4656

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Levanas, Michael

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

Oliver Turner

El Camino Investment Company, Inc.

Richard Mills

Mauricio Rivas

Appellants and Plaintiffs

El Camino Investment Company, Inc.

Richard Mills

Mauricio Rivas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Alexander Joshua Zeesman

Attorney at Accident Fighters, APC

11145 Tampa Ave. Suite 4B

Northridge, CA 91326

Kevin Shawn Conlogue

Attorney at Law Office of Kevin S. Conlogue

292 S. La Cienega Blvd. Suite 207

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Robert A. Olson

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036

David Eric Hackett

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire Blvd 12Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90036

John S. Levitt

Attorney at Soltman, Levitt, Flaherty & Wattles

90 E. Thousand Oaks Blvd #300

Thousand Oaks, CA 91360

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Robert A. Olson

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036

David Eric Hackett

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire Blvd 12Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90036

John S. Levitt

Attorney at Soltman, Levitt, Flaherty & Wattles

90 E. Thousand Oaks Blvd #300

Thousand Oaks, CA 91360

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2023
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Dec. 2, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Nov. 23, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: El Camino Investment Company, Inc. Attorney: John S. Levitt Plaintiff and Appellant: Richard Mills Attorney: John S. Levitt Plaintiff and Appellant: Mauricio Rivas Attorney: John S. Levitt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Robert A. Olson/David E. Hackett c/o Greines Martin Stein & Richland LLP associates in for appellants.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: El Camino Investment Company, Inc.Attorney: John S. Levitt Plaintiff and Appellant: Richard MillsAttorney: John S. Levitt Plaintiff and Appellant: Mauricio RivasAttorney: John S. Levitt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #403171 for $775 from lasc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on November 18, 2022 by El Camino Investment Company, Inc., Richard Mills and Mauricio Rivas.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV05571; Trial Court Judge: Levanas, Michael

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EL CAMINO INVESTMENT COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Eric Hackett

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVITT JOHN S.