This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/01/2023 at 08:01:04 (UTC).

Tunucci v. Burdick

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 Tunucci filed an Other lawsuit against Burdick. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Schulman, Ethan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3344

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Schulman, Ethan

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Veronica Tunucci

Defendant and Respondent

Christopher D. Burdick

Interested Party

City and County of San Francisco Office of the Assessor-Recorder

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Respondent and Interested Party Attorneys

David Sen-Fu Chiu

Peter A. Cownan

Jonathan C. Rolnick

Katherine H. Porter

Dennis J. Herrera

 

Court Documents

A163344

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: The petition for review is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record transmitted to Supreme Court electronically.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying rehearing petition filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT: The petition for rehearing is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Rehearing petition filed.; Notes: By appellant.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in full; Disposition Type: Final The judgment is affirmed. The parties shall bear their own costs on appeal. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.278(a)(5).); Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Rodriguez, Victor A.; Participants: Petrou, Ioana (Concur) Tucher, Alison M. (Concur)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) The judgment is affirmed. The parties shall bear their own costs on appeal. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.278(a)(5).)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.; Notes: Veronica Tunucci appellant in pro per and Peter A. Cownan for Respondent/RPI.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Transmittal Sheet from SF Superior Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: Clerk's notice to Counsel re missing documents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 08/25/2021. Designating additional CT documents.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Veronica Tunucci Pro Per with order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Veronica TunucciPro Per; Notes: with order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 08/16/2021. Designating CT with RT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check # 6023, Veronic A. Tunucci

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 08/10/2021 by Plaintiff Veronica Tunucci in propria persona appealing judgment from 08/05/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CPF21517418; Trial Court Judge: Schulman, Ethan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less