This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/07/2023 at 20:05:55 (UTC).

Tulare Lake Canal Company v. Sandridge Partners L.P. et al.

Case Summary

On 06/03/2022 Tulare Lake Canal Company filed an Other lawsuit against Sandridge Partners L P. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chrissakis, Valerie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4439

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Chrissakis, Valerie

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Tulare Lake Canal Company

Appellants and Defendants

Sandridge Partners L.P.

Roller Land Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Leonard C. Herr

Attorney at Dooley, Herr & Peltzer

100 Willow Plaza, Suite 300

Visalia, CA 93291

Ronald Scott Statler

Attorney at Herr Pedersen & Berglund LLP

100 Willow Plz Ste 300

Visalia, CA 93291

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Scott M. Reddie

Attorney at McCormick, Barstow, Sheppard, Wayte & Carruth LLP

7647 N. Fresno Street

Fresno, CA 93720

Marshall C. Whitney

Attorney at Whitney, Thompson & Jeffcoach LLP

970 W. Alluvial Ave

Fresno, CA 93711

Kristi D. Marshall

Attorney at Whitney, Thompson & Jeffcoach LLP

970 W. Alluvial Ave

Fresno, CA 93711-5510

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Roller Land Company Attorney: Scott M. Reddie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Roller Land CompanyAttorney: Scott M. Reddie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Misc. fee received for:; Notes: $390 Responsive Fee paid via truefiling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Tulare Lake Canal Company Attorney: Leonard C. Herr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Tulare Lake Canal CompanyAttorney: Leonard C. Herr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Tulare Lake Canal Company You are hereby notified that if respondent's brief is not on file or good cause for relief shown within 15 days after the date of this notice, the appeal may be submitted for decision upon the record and the appellant(s) opening brief. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.220(a)(2).)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Tulare Lake Canal Company; Notes: You are hereby notified that if respondent's brief is not on file or good cause for relief shown within 15 days after the date of this notice, the appeal may be submitted for decision upon the record and the appellant(s) opening brief. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.220(a)(2).)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: 1st Request

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: 1st Request

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 filing fee paid via check on 6/9/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Atty Whitney obo applt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Attorney address changed.; Notes: address for atty Whitney updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Dear Counsel and Kings County Superior Court: The Court has determined that the above entitled appeal is not suitable for mediation, please disregard previously sent letter. Pursuant to Court of Appeal, Fifth District, Local Rules, rule 2 (Mediation in Civil Appeals), the suspension of the operation of California Rules of Court, rules 8.121, 8.124, and 8.216 requiring designation of the record on appeal, payment of the estimated costs of preparation of the record on appeal, and submission of a proposed briefing schedule is terminated as of this date. You are directed to comply immediately with the applicable California Rules of Court as if the notice of appeal was filed as of the date of this letter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email received from:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Telephone conversation with:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: the parties and Superior Court notifying that the mediation questionnaires are due within 10 days; Civil Case Information statement remains due 15 days after the superior court sends notification.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Dear Marshall Whitney: California Rules of Court, rule 8.100(b)(1) provides that the notice of appeal must be accompanied by a $775 filing fee or an application for waiver of court fees and costs. Since the copy of your notice of appeal filed was not accompanied by either, your appeal may be dismissed within 15 days of this notice unless you either transmit the filing fee or show good cause why the court should excuse payment of those fees. Although you may have previously submitted an application for waiver of court fees and costs in the superior court, you must also submit a separate application addressed to this court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Atty Whitney obo applt filed an appeal on 6/3/22 as to judgment ordered 4/4/22 re: Order Granting Request for Preliminary Injunction by Tulare Lake Canal Company; Order Vacating Preliminary Injunction Issues Against Cross-Defendants on 3/7/22 and 6/1/22 re: Order Denying Motion to Dissolve Preliminary Injunction.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Kings County Superior Court - Main; County: Kings; Trial Court Case Number: 22C0019; Trial Court Judge: Chrissakis, Valerie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tulare Lake Canal Company is a litigant

Latest cases where SANDRIDGE PARTNERS, L.P., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marshall, Kristi D.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Whitney, Marshall C.