This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 12/05/2022 at 19:05:32 (UTC).

Tufeld Corporation v. Beverly Hills Gateway, L.P. **PREFERENCE**

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 Tufeld Corporation filed an Other lawsuit against Beverly Hills Gateway, L P PREFERENCE. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Landin, Dennis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4862

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Landin, Dennis

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Tufeld Corporation

Beverly Hills Gateway, L.P.

Appellant and Defendant

Beverly Hills Gateway, L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

James L. Goldman

Attorney at Miller Barondess LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Bruce Adelstein

Attorney at Law Offices of Bruce Adelstein

16311 Ventura Blvd., Suite 1200

Encino, CA 91436-2152

Jennifer Mira Hashmall

Attorney at Miller Barondess, LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Arthur Desbarats Fels

Attorney at Loeb & Loeb LLP

10100 Santa Monica Blvd. Ste 2200

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4120

Daniel G. Murphy

Attorney at Loeb & Loeb

1000 Santa Monica Blvd. Suite 2200

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Stefan Caris Love

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire Blvd, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Andrew S. Pauly

Attorney at Shoreline, A Law Corporation

1299 Ocean Avenue, Suite 400

Santa Monica, CA 90401-1007

David Eric Hackett

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire Blvd 12Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Robin Meadow

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Daniel J. Friedman

Attorney at Loeb & Loeb

10100 Santa Monica Blvd. Suite 2200

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4164

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Arthur Desbarats Fels

Attorney at Loeb & Loeb LLP

10100 Santa Monica Blvd. Ste 2200

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4120

Daniel G. Murphy

Attorney at Loeb & Loeb

1000 Santa Monica Blvd. Suite 2200

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Stefan Caris Love

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire Blvd, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Andrew S. Pauly

Attorney at Shoreline, A Law Corporation

1299 Ocean Avenue, Suite 400

Santa Monica, CA 90401-1007

David Eric Hackett

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire Blvd 12Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Robin Meadow

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Daniel J. Friedman

Attorney at Loeb & Loeb

10100 Santa Monica Blvd. Suite 2200

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4164

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • HearingDescription: Opinion filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: This case is ordered on calendar for November 1, 2022, at 09:00 AM. Parties have requested in-person appearance. The courtroom is located on the 3rd floor at 300 S. Spring St., Los Angeles, CA 90013. The courtroom will not be open to the public. The live video feed will be available on the Second District Court of Appeal's calendar page on the court's website: https://www.courts.ca.gov/11603.htm. For the Court's policy on electronic devices, see: ww.courts.ca.gov/documents/2DCA-Hours-Courtroom.pdf.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Robin Meadow for Appellant/Cross-Respondent Beverly Hills Gateway L.P. (30 minutes) In Person

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: James Goldman for Respondent/Cross-Appellant Tufeld Corp. (30 minutes) In Person

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent electronically. Calendar date:; Notes: November 1 or 2 , morning or afternoon (specific date and time to be noticed after calendar responses returned to the clerk)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Tufeld Corporation Attorney: Jennifer Mira Hashmall [CROSS-REPLY BRIEF]One extension granted for a total of 30 days: 06/20/2022 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 07/22/2022 By 30 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Tufeld CorporationAttorney: Jennifer Mira Hashmall; Notes: [CROSS-REPLY BRIEF]One extension granted for a total of 30 days: 06/20/2022 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 07/22/2022 By 30 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Tufeld CorporationAttorney: Jennifer Mira Hashmall; Notes: (Cross-Appeal filed 9/3/2021 by Tufeld Corporation) ("U1")

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: check# 1053921 for $775.00 (Nationwide Legal, LLC)(Appeal filed 8/26/2021 by Beverly Hills Gateway, L.P.) ("U")

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Loeb & Loeb LLP and Shoreline associate the law firm of Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP as co-counsel for appellant Beverly Hills Gateway, L.P.McCormick Barstow LLP withdraws as counsel for Beverly Hills Gateway, L.P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Beverly Hills Gateway, L.P. Attorney: Scott M Reddie (Appeal filed 8/26/2021) ("U")

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Beverly Hills Gateway, L.P.Attorney: Scott M Reddie; Notes: (Appeal filed 8/26/2021) ("U")

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: (Cross-Appeal filed 9/3/2021 by Tufeld Corporation) ("U1")

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of Cross-Appeal filed 9/3/2021 by Tufeld Corporation ("U1")

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Appeal filed 8/26/2021 by Beverly Hills Gateway, L.P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 8/26/2021 by Beverly Hills Gateway, L.P. ("U")

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC691352; Trial Court Judge: Landin, Dennis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TUFELD CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BEVERLY HILLS GATEWAY L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stefan Caris Love

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Eric Hackett