This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/31/2022 at 01:05:04 (UTC).

T.S. v. Superior Court for the County of Solano

Case Summary

On 04/25/2022 T S filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court for the County of Solano. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Stashyn, Donna. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5047

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Stashyn, Donna

 

Party Details

Petitioner

T. S.

Respondent

Superior Court for the County of Solano

Interested Parties

Solano County Health & Social Services Department

A. P.

D. P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Tracy Marie De Soto

Attorney at Windansea Law Offices

7584 Trade Street

San Diego, CA 92121

Caroline Rosen DeBois

Po Box 1634

Benicia, CA 94510-4634

Interested Party Attorneys

Office of Solano County Counsel

675 Texas Street - Suite 6600

Fairfield, CA 94533

Ann Purayampallil Jackson

1234 Empire St Ste 1200

Fairfield, CA 94533-5711

Janice Rose Stillman

1234 Empire St Ste 2304

Fairfield, CA 94533-5711

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final BY THE COURT: In that neither counsel for petitioner nor petitioner acting in propria persona filed a petition for extraordinary writ within the time permitted (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.452(c)(l)), the above-entitled action is dismissed as abandoned. (Karl S. v. Superior Court (1995) 34 Cal.App.4th 1397, 1404.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Notes: BY THE COURT: In that neither counsel for petitioner nor petitioner acting in propria persona filed a petition for extraordinary writ within the time permitted (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.452(c)(l)), the above-entitled action is dismissed as abandoned. (Karl S. v. Superior Court (1995) 34 Cal.App.4th 1397, 1404.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: No Issue Statement Filed by Counsel; Notes: Petitioner: T. S. Attorney: Tracy Marie De Soto filed by attorney for mother.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketBrief: No Issue Statement Filed by Counsel; Party Attorney: Petitioner: T. S.Attorney: Tracy Marie De Soto; Notes: filed by attorney for mother.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: to all parties stating the petition is due May 27, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: One Volume RT - April 15, 2022 Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: Volume 1 of 1; Pages 1 - 193 Confidential: May Not Be Examined Without A Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: Volume 1 of 1; Pages 1 - 193

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Note:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Court reporter extension granted.; Notes: Note:. Due on 05/12/2022 By 3 Day(s) CSR M. Luna to 5/12/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Tracy De Soto associated as co-counsel for petitioner T.S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Court reporter extension requested.; Notes: CSR M. Luna to 5/12/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: W & I 366.26 Hearing is August 11, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received notice of intent.; Notes: from Caroline DeBois, attorney for T. S., mother

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Solano County Superior Court - Main; County: Solano; Trial Court Case Number: J45337; Trial Court Judge: Stashyn, Donna

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court for the County of Solano is a litigant

Latest cases where Solano County Health and Social Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ann Purayampallil Jackson