This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 10/06/2021 at 13:45:35 (UTC).

TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE v. FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8940

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Truck Insurance Exchange

Appellant and Defendant

Federal Insurance Company

Not Yet Classified

Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath

Martin W. Anderson

Santa Ana, CA 92705-7400

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott R. Hoyt

Attorney at Pia Anderson Dorius Reynard & Moss

136 E. South Temple, 19Th Floor

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

John Phillip Mertens

Attorney at PADRM, LLC

136 E. South Temple Street, 19Th Floor

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Kirk C. Chamberlin

Attorney at Chamberlin & Keaster LLP

15821 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 165

Encino, CA 91436-2758

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Alan J. Lazarus

Attorney at Faegre, Drinker, Biddle & Reath LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4180

Martin W. Anderson

Attorney at Anderson Law Firm

2070 North Tustin Avenue

Santa Ana, CA 92705-7400

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 1 doghouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition denied; CA opinion decertified

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied; CA opinion decertified; Notes: The petition for review is denied. The request for an order directing depublication of the opinion is granted. The Reporter of Decisions is directed not to publish in the Official Appellate Reports the opinion in the above-entitled appeal filed April 7, 2021, which appears at 63 Cal.App.5th 211. (Cal. Const., art. VI, section 14; Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.1125(c)(1).)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including August 26, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Letter dated July 14, 2021 Truck Insurance Exchange, Plaintiff and Respondent Scott R. Hoyt, Retained counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Federal Insurance Company Attorney: Kirk C. Chamberlin Reply to answer to petition filed. Due on 07/13/2021 By 0 Day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Extension of time granted; Notes: On application of defendant and appellant and good cause appearing, it is ordered that the time to serve and file the reply to answer to petition for review is extended to and including July 13, 2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for extension of time filed; Notes: -------------------------------------------------------------------------------- Federal Insurance Company, Defendant and Appellant Kirk C. Chamberlin, Retained counsel By Kirk C. Chamberlin, counsel for appellant, requesting a 15-day extension of time to file the reply to answer to petition for review by July 13, 2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Truck Insurance Exchange Attorney: Scott R. Hoyt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One doghouse.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case start date (depublication request)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed (after initial pub/depublication request); Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Federal Insurance Company Attorney: Kirk C. Chamberlin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for depublication filed (initial case event); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: Martin W. Anderson Attorney: Martin W. Anderson *Opinion ordered published by the Court of Appeal on 4/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 8; Court of Appeal Case Number: B302365; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV26702

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Truck Insurance Exchange is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Phillip Mertens

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOYT SCOTT R.