This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/11/2023 at 09:04:59 (UTC).

Trope v. PEAM, LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 07/08/2022 Trope filed an Other lawsuit against PEAM, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Long, Thomas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2008

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Long, Thomas

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Raquel Trope

Defendants and Respondents

PEAM, LLC

Khara Johnson

Aiden Hylton

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Martin R. Berman

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Ann C. Hall

J. Jackson Briscoe

Dean Bradley Solomon

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.; Notes: Costs on appeal are awarded pursuant to California Rules of Court Rule 8.278(a)(2).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Pursuant to Appellant's request, the appeal filed July 8, 2022 is dismissed. The clerk shall issue the remittitur forthwith. Costs on appeal are awarded pursuant to California Rules of Court Rule 8.278(a)(2).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: appellant's request for dismissal of appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: FOUR: Clerks (918 Pages), ONE: reporter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: Notice dated Jan. 12, 2023: The minute order(s) indicate that a court reporter was not present at the time of hearing or trial. (Proceeding dated 5/10/2022). Therefore, the Civil Appeals Unit will not notify any court reporter(s) to prepare transcripts.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellant counsel's letter submitted on Jan 9, 2023 is rejected. All parties are required to file documents electronically. (CRC, rule 8.71 (a)) -- may resubmit filing via TrueFiling.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order of dismissal vacated.; Notes: The court has read and considered appellant's November 22, 2022 motion to vacate dismissal and reinstate appeal. Good cause appearing, appellant's motion is granted and the appeal dated July 8, 2022, is hereby reinstated on condition that appellant pay reporter's transcript fees and deposits with the clerk of the superior court within ten (10) days from the date of this order. Failure to comply shall result in the immediate dismissal of this appeal without further notice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.140(b).; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.140(b), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed July 8, 2022, is dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default re: 8.130(b) rptrs fees not deposited rcvd. dtd.; Notes: Notice Non-Compliance Default dated October 27, 2022; Notice of Default dated August 23, 2022 for failure to pay/deposit reporter's transcript fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Sept. 13, 2022: 8.122 w. RT - (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #3230 for $775

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Raquel Trope Attorney: Martin R. Berman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case information statement returned for correction.; Notes: Civil case information statement submitted on August 3, 2022 returned for failure to attach the appealed order. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g)(1).)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Raquel TropeAttorney: Martin R. Berman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Appellant's civil filing fee ($775)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed July 8, 2022 by Raquel Trope (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC708578; Trial Court Judge: Long, Thomas

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less