This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 11/26/2021 at 08:59:51 (UTC).

TRINITY RISK MANAGEMENT v. SIMPLIFIED LABOR STAFFING SOLUTIONS

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 TRINITY RISK MANAGEMENT filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against SIMPLIFIED LABOR STAFFING SOLUTIONS. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7230

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellants and Not Yet Classified

Harold J. Knight

Michel Powers

Knight Management Group, Inc.

Trinity Risk Management, LLC

Sam Delois

Labornow, Inc.

Respondents and Cross Defendants

Ashish Wahi

Michael Dougan

Simplified Labor Staffing Solutions, Inc.

Simplified Staffing Labor Solutions, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Donald S. Burris

Attorney at Burris Shoenberg, LLP

12121 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 504

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Clarissa Rodriguez

Attorney at Burris Schoenberg, LLP

12121 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 504

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Respondent and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Rodney Scott Lasher

Attorney at Hill Farrer & Burrill, LLP

300 South Grand Avenue, 37Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3147

Clayton J. Hix

Attorney at Hill Farrer & Burrill, LLP

300 South Grand Avenue, 37Th Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Ali Zamin Vaqar

Attorney at Walton Law Group, P.C.

35 North Lake Avenue, Suite 700

Pasadena, CA 91101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Cross-complainant and Appellant: Trinity Risk Management, LLC Attorney: Donald S. Burris Cross-complainant and Appellant: Knight Management Group, Inc. Attorney: Donald S. Burris Cross-complainant and Appellant: Labornow, Inc. Attorney: Donald S. Burris Cross-complainant and Appellant: Harold J. Knight Attorney: Donald S. Burris Cross-complainant and Appellant: Sam Delois Attorney: Donald S. Burris Cross-complainant and Appellant: Michel Powers Attorney: Donald S. Burris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Cross-defendant and Respondent: Simplified Labor Staffing Solutions, Inc. Attorney: Rodney Scott Lasher Cross-defendant and Respondent: Ashish Wahi Attorney: Rodney Scott Lasher Cross-defendant and Respondent: Simplified Staffing Labor Solutions, LLC Attorney: Rodney Scott Lasher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Cross-complainant and Appellant: Trinity Risk Management, LLC Attorney: Donald S. Burris Cross-complainant and Appellant: Knight Management Group, Inc. Attorney: Donald S. Burris Cross-complainant and Appellant: Labornow, Inc. Attorney: Donald S. Burris Cross-complainant and Appellant: Harold J. Knight Attorney: Donald S. Burris Cross-complainant and Appellant: Sam Delois Attorney: Donald S. Burris Cross-complainant and Appellant: Michel Powers Attorney: Donald S. Burris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 8; Court of Appeal Case Number: B297176; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BC709369

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SIMPLIFIED LABOR STAFFING SOLUTIONS INC. is a litigant