This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/09/2023 at 00:45:49 (UTC).

TriCoast Builders Inc v. MUFG Union Bank et al.

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 TriCoast Builders Inc filed an Other lawsuit against MUFG Union Bank. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mackey, Malcolm. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4073

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mackey, Malcolm

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

TriCoast Builders Inc

Respondents and Defendants

MUFG Union Bank

Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Thomas Connette

Attorney at Connette Law Office

201 Santa Monica Blvd Suite 300

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Daniel Joshua Enowitz

Attorney at Marcus, Watanabe & Enowitz

11377 W. Olympic Boulevard 5Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Kathleen Mary DeLaney

Attorney at Rudloff Wood & Barrows LLP

2000 Powell St #900

Emeryville, CA 94608

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's reply brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: MUFG Union Bank Attorney: Daniel Joshua Enowitz One extension granted for a total of 60 days: 09/28/2022 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 12/20/2022 By 60 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Due Date: 02/08/2023; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: TriCoast Builders IncAttorney: Michael Thomas Connette

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: MUFG Union BankAttorney: Daniel Joshua Enowitz; Notes: One extension granted for a total of 60 days: 09/28/2022 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 12/20/2022 By 60 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company Attorney: Kathleen Mary DeLaney One extension granted for a total of 60 days: 09/29/2022 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 12/20/2022 By 60 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Travelers Property Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney: Kathleen Mary DeLaney; Notes: One extension granted for a total of 60 days: 09/29/2022 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 12/20/2022 By 60 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Respondents' and Appellant's reply briefs.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Respondents' and Appellant's reply briefs.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: TriCoast Builders Inc Attorney: Michael Thomas Connette Two extensions granted for a total of 47 days: 05/27/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 07/18/2022 By 40 Day(s) 05/27/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 07/18/2022 By 40 Day(s) 07/12/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 07/25/2022 By 7 Day(s) 07/12/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 07/25/2022 By 7 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: TriCoast Builders IncAttorney: Michael Thomas Connette; Notes: Two extensions granted for a total of 47 days: 05/27/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 07/18/2022 By 40 Day(s) 05/27/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 07/18/2022 By 40 Day(s) 07/12/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 07/25/2022 By 7 Day(s) 07/12/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 07/25/2022 By 7 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice for responsive filing fee sent to:; Notes: Respondent Travelers Property Casualty Ins. Co.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: 1) Respondent Travelers Commercial Ins. Co.'s motion to Declare Related Case on Appeal; 2) Declaration of Edward P. Murphy in Support of...(4pages); 3) Declaration of Edward P. Murphy in Support of...(63pages); 4) [Proposed] Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Filed Aug 6, 2021: Requests additional documents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Sept. 7, 2021: 8.122 no RT - (U1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: TriCoast Builders Inc Attorney: Michael Thomas Connette (U1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: TriCoast Builders IncAttorney: Michael Thomas Connette; Notes: (U1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Appellant's filing fee paid via credit card.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on July 12, 2021 by TriCoast Builders Inc(U1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC647811; Trial Court Judge: Mackey, Malcolm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tricoast Builders, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where MUFG UNION BANK N.A. A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DeLaney, Kathleen Mary