This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/30/2022 at 02:23:26 (UTC).

TriCoast Builders, Inc. v. Barnhisel et al.

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 TriCoast Builders, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Barnhisel. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mackey, Malcolm. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3213

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mackey, Malcolm

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

TriCoast Builders, Inc.

Respondents and Defendants

Stacey Barnhisel

Joshua Haber

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Michael Thomas Connette

Attorney at Connette Law Office

201 Santa Monica Blvd Ste 300

Santa Monica, CA 90401-2224

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Daniel O'Leary

Attorney at Law Offices of Daniel M O'Leary

2300 Westwood Blvd. Suite 105

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Anthony Jason Rothman

2300 Westwood Blvd Ste 105

Los Angeles, CA 90064-2045

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Pursuant to the stipulation for dismissal of appeal filed January 13, 2022, the appeal filed May 25, 2021 is dismissed. The remittitur shall issue forthwith (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.244(c)(2).)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: Stipulation for dismissal of appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: TriCoast Builders, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Notice of association of counsel Daniel M. O'Leary for respondents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-1 (239 Pages)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: TriCoast Builders, Inc. Attorney: Michael Thomas Connette (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: TriCoast Builders, Inc.Attorney: Michael Thomas Connette; Notes: (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant is in default for failure to file a complete Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g), for the appeal filed May 25, 2021(U). So that the Court can establish jurisdiction and appealability, the Court requires appellant to provide a fully completed statement with appropriate documents. The enclosed form is being returned because it is lacking NO Signed order or Judgment being appealed. A NEW PROOF OF SERVICE IS REQUIRED ON OPPOSING PARTY TO INCLUDE A COPY OF THE COMPLETE CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT. (CRC rules 8.100(g)(2) & 8.25(a)(1) & (2)). If a Case Information Statement is not filed within 15 days from the date of this notice, or it is not completely filled out or it is lacking the attachments as required, the court may impose sanctions, including dismissal on the grounds of non-compliance with rule 8.100(g), and failure to establish that this court has jurisdiction over the case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case information statement returned for correction.; Notes: NO Signed order or Judgment being appealed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil filing fee paid by Connette, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated June 4, 2021: 8.122 no RT - (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd - (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: May 25, 2021: TriCoast Builders, Inc. - (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC647811; Trial Court Judge: Mackey, Malcolm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tricoast Builders, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROTHMAN ANTHONY JASON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'LEARY DANIEL