This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/19/2022 at 02:25:54 (UTC).

Tracy 300, LP v. Lau

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 Tracy 300, LP filed an Other lawsuit against Lau. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fattarsi, Jonathan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3795

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Fattarsi, Jonathan

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Tracy 300, LP

Respondent and Defendant

King Sing Lau

Tracy, CA 95304

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin Anthony Harris

Attorney at Harris Rosales & Harris LLP

1056 Division Street

Pleasanton, CA 94566

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.; Notes: Respondent to recover costs on appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: As nonappealable. HULL, Acting P.J., ROBIE, J., MAURO, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's mediation statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re CAMS.; Notes: Due 10 days after appellant's filing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter to counsel advising of due date of Civil Case Information Statement.; Notes: and Appellant's Mediation Statement due: 4/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Appellant's paid. Receipt Number: R324822.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 3/17/2021. Unlawful detainer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Joaquin County Superior Court; County: San Joaquin; Trial Court Case Number: MANCVLUDR2020010287; Trial Court Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRACY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARRIS, KEVIN A