This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/06/2022 at 02:00:13 (UTC).

Tourney Professional Partners LLC v. Jack E Wasserstein, DDS

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 Tourney Professional Partners LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Jack E Wasserstein, DDS. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Young, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5019

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Young, Mark

 

Party Details

Respondent and Petitioner

Tourney Professional Partners LLC

Appellant

Jack E Wasserstein, DDS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Petitioner Attorney

Justin James Morgan

Attorney at Wood and Delgado

25950 Acero Ste 300

Mission Viejo, CA 92691

Appellant Attorney

William B. DeClercq

Attorney at Taylor English Duma LLP

445 S Figueroa Street Suite 3100

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1635

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Sept. 16, 2021: 8.122 w. Settled Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Appellant: Jack E Wasserstein, DDS Attorney: William B. DeClercq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Appellant: Jack E Wasserstein, DDSAttorney: William B. DeClercq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (8/24/2021 by Jack E Wasserstein, DDS ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: appeal filing fee: check# D4024520 for $775.00 (InfoTrack US, Inc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 8/24/2021 by Jack E Wasserstein, DDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 21SMCP00037; Trial Court Judge: Young, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOURNEY PROFESSIONAL PARTNERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DECLERCQ WILLIAM