This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/20/2021 at 00:16:33 (UTC).

Torres et al. v. Alston Construction Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 Torres filed an Other lawsuit against Alston Construction Company, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Rosales, Olivia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9232

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Rosales, Olivia

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Leonel Carrasco Torres

Maria Del Carmen Reyes Sanchez

Defendant and Respondent

Alston Construction Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Emily A. Ruby

Attorney at Greenberg & Ruby LLP

6100 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1170

Los Angeles, CA 90048

Mark David Kemple

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

1840 Century Park East Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Janet R. Gusdorff

Attorney at Gusdorff Law, P.C.

4607 Lakeview Canyon Road Suite 375

Westlake Village, CA 91361

Jaime G. Farias

Attorney at The Farias Firm, PC

17525 Ventura Blvd Ste 201

Encino, CA 91316-5108

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Maureen Claire O'Hara

Attorney at Ropers, Majerki, Kohn & Bentley

445 South Figueroa Street Suite 3000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Daniel R. Friedenthal

Attorney at Friedenthal Heffernan & Brown, LLP

215 N.Marengo Ave Suite 165

Pasadena, CA 91101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2021
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 07/09/2021 By 60 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Dec. 7, 2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Leonel Carrasco Torres Attorney: Emily A. Ruby Attorney: Jaime G. Farias Attorney: Janet R. Gusdorff Plaintiff and Appellant: Maria Del Carmen Reyes Sanchez Attorney: Emily A. Ruby Attorney: Jaime G. Farias Attorney: Janet R. Gusdorff (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Due Date: 07/09/2021; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Leonel Carrasco TorresAttorney: Emily A. Ruby Attorney: Jaime G. Farias Attorney: Janet R. Gusdorff Attorney: Mark David Kemple Plaintiff and Appellant: Maria Del Carmen Reyes Sanchez

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Leonel Carrasco TorresAttorney: Emily A. Ruby Attorney: Jaime G. Farias Attorney: Janet R. Gusdorff Plaintiff and Appellant: Maria Del Carmen Reyes SanchezAttorney: Emily A. Ruby Attorney: Jaime G. Farias Attorney: Janet R. Gusdorff; Notes: (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: (U)Civil filing fee paid by Emily Ruby.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Nov. 16, 2020: Leonel C. Torres, et al. (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC670915; Trial Court Judge: Rosales, Olivia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less