This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/12/2022 at 02:55:14 (UTC).

Topa v. Superior Court Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 11/30/2021 Topa filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Court, Michelle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6636

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Court, Michelle

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Nancy Topa

San Juan Capistrano, CA 92693

Respondents

Superior Court Los Angeles County

Trial Court Judge

Hon. Michelle Williams Court

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Parties

Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club

ACSC Management Services

Automobile Club of Southern California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Hon. Michelle Williams Court

Los Angeles Superior Court 111 N. Hill St., Dept. 74

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorney

Phillip E. Smith

Attorney at Smith Smith & Feeley LLP

1401 Dove St Ste 610

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record transmitted to Supreme Court electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final THE COURT: * The petition for writ of mandate filed on November 30, 2021 (No. B316636) has been read and considered, along with the petition for writ of mandate filed on December 2, 2021 (No. B316744). Both petitions are denied because petitioner failed to demonstrate a prima facie case entitling her to extraordinary relief. (See, e.g., Flier v. Superior Court (1994) 23 Cal.App.4th 165, 170-171.) In addition, petitioner's petition/request to transfer both petitions is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT: * The petition for writ of mandate filed on November 30, 2021 (No. B316636) has been read and considered, along with the petition for writ of mandate filed on December 2, 2021 (No. B316744). Both petitions are denied because petitioner failed to demonstrate a prima facie case entitling her to extraordinary relief. (See, e.g., Flier v. Superior Court (1994) 23 Cal.App.4th 165, 170-171.) In addition, petitioner's petition/request to transfer both petitions is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Petition to the Adminsitrative Presiding Justice for Transfer of Appeal to Supreme Court or to Division 6 of the 2nd district

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Response filed:; Notes: Petitioner's response to letter filed by counsel for RPI on 12/2/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Phillip E Smith, Counsel for RPI Interinsurance Exhange et al, regarding voluntary dismissal of lower court proceedings by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: By Nancy Topa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Proof of Service for Petition for Writ of Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Petition for Writ of Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACSC MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB is a litigant