This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/25/2022 at 06:18:44 (UTC).

Tia Griffin et al. v. Riverside Community College et al.

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 Tia Griffin filed an Other lawsuit against Riverside Community College. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Firetag, Chad. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8349

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Firetag, Chad

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Tia Griffin

Riverside, CA 92506

Daelani Griffin

Riverside, CA 92506

Respondents and Defendants

Riverside Community College

Riverside City College

Riverside Community College Police Department

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Teresa C. Chow

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

11601 Wilshire Blvd Ste 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90025-509

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: As appellants have failed to comply with this court's order filed March 22, 2022, and have failed to timely designate the record on appeal, the appeal is dismissed as abandoned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Certificate of county clerk re appellants' noncompliance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of county clerk filed.; Notes: Appellants failed to timely designate the record on appeal, per court's Mar 22, 2022, order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order on motion filed.; Notes: The court has considered appellants' motion for relief from default filed February 17, 2022, as well as respondents' untimely opposition filed March 22, 2022. Appellants' motion for relief from default is granted. Appellants are to serve and file a designation of record on appeal with the clerk of the superior court on or before 10 days from the date of this order. Appellants are encouraged to utilize the California Appellate Courts Self-Help Resource Center located at https://selfhelp.appellate.courts.ca.gov.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: by respondent to motion for relief from default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: opposition and declaration-Declaration cannot be filed under separate cover, must be filed as one document with the opposition. Also, the responsive filing fee of $390.00 is due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Appellants' motion for relief from default, Entry of Default & CCIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion for relief from default filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice received-appellant notified per rule 8.140(a)(1).; Notes: dtd Feb 14, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: Based on appellants' requests, the statutory filing fees are waived.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: re appellant Daelani Griffin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: re appellant Tia Griffin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Jan 10, 2022; Tia Griffin, et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: RIC2001742; Trial Court Judge: Firetag, Chad

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHOW TERESA C.