This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 05/21/2021 at 00:00:19 (UTC).

Thuy Tran v. County of Riverside

Case Summary

On 11/10/2020 Thuy Tran filed an Other lawsuit against County of Riverside. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Stamen, Randall. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6133

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Stamen, Randall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Thuy Tran

Defendant and Respondent

County of Riverside

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Matthew Gutierrez

Attorney at Gutierrez Derham Law Firm LLP

26459 Rancho Pkwy S., Suite 1

Lake Forest, CA 92630-8326

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Douglas C. Smith

Attorney at Smith Law Offices

4001 Eleventh Street

Riverside, CA 92501

Karen Lynn Capasso

Attorney at Smith Law Offices

4001 Eleventh Street

Riverside, CA 92501

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2022
  • HearingDescription: Case in basement storage.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final REMOTE settlement conference held on 03/10 /21. Case did not settle at settlement conference. Notice of Settlement filed on 04/26/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.; Notes: COMBINED Remittitur and Dismissal Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Remittitur to issue immediately

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: By Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stay order filed.; Notes: Pursuant to the Notice of Settlement filed by Appellant on 04/26/21, this appeal is STAYED, including all briefing. Appellant's counsel is DIRECTED to file a request for dismissal on or before 45 days from the date of this order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Notice of Settlement of Appeal filed by Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Settlement not pos., appellant noticed to file AOB.; Notes: The stay filed 02/10/21 is DISSOLVED, and all proceedings in the appeal are ORDERED to RECOMMENCE. The record on appeal has been filed. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix are to be file on or before 40 days from the date of this order (parties noticed RE: exhibts).

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Settlement notice sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: CCIS & Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: counsel; notice re no fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Nov 10, 2020; Thuy Tran

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: RIC1900510; Trial Court Judge: Stamen, Randall

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE (DOE 3) is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUTIERREZ MATTHEW