This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/04/2022 at 01:30:34 (UTC).

Thomas v. The Superior Court of Orange County

Case Summary

On 03/28/2022 Thomas filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Orange County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is George, Stephanie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1243

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

George, Stephanie

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Denise Thomas

Respondent

The Superior Court of Orange County

Attn: Hon. Stephanie George Dept. C-74 700 Civic Center Drive West

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Interested Party

Booker Burney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Ernest Rey Calhoon

Attorney at Law Offices of Ernest Calhoon

8282 Sierra Avenue, Suite 4131

Fontana, CA 92335

Interested Party Attorney

Christopher W. Bayuk

Attorney at Bayuk & Associates, Inc.

5170 Golden Foothill Pkwy

El Dorado Hills, CA 95762

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: filed by petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record shipped to records center; Notes: all documents scanned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT:* The petition for writ of mandate is DENIED. O'LEARY, P. J. * Before O'Leary, P. J., Moore, J., and Marks, J.** **Judge of the Orange County Superior Court, assigned by the Chief Justice pursuant to article VI, section 6 of the California Constitution.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed.; Notes: filed by petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Amended petition filed.; Notes: filed by petitioner Denise Thomas Writ of Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: By petitioner Denise Thomas Located in "F" drive sealed cabinet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: By petitioner Denise Thomas Writ of Mandate(60 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Superior Court of Orange County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAYUK CHRISTOPHER WEBB