This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/07/2022 at 05:05:13 (UTC).

Thomas v. The Superior Court of Orange County

Case Summary

On 03/21/2022 Thomas filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Orange County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is George, Stephanie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1219

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

George, Stephanie

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Denise Thomas

Respondent

The Superior Court of Orange County

Attn: Hon. Stephanie George Dept. C24 700 Civic Center Drive West

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Interested Parties

The Law Offices of Booker T. Burney

Booker Burney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Ernest Rey Calhoon

Attorney at Law Offices of Ernest Calhoon

8282 Sierra Avenue, Suite 4131

Fontana, CA 92335

Interested Party Attorney

Christopher W. Bayuk

Attorney at Bayuk & Associates, Inc.

5170 Golden Foothill Pkwy

El Dorado Hills, CA 95762

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: Filed by petitioner. Supreme Court Case Number S274476

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record transmitted to Supreme Court electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record shipped to records center; Notes: All documents are scanned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT:* The petition for writ of mandate is DENIED. O'LEARY, P. J. * Before O'Leary, P. J., Moore, J., and Marks, J.* *Judge of the Orange County Superior Court, assigned by the Chief Justice pursuant to article VI, section 6 of the California Constitution.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Amended petition filed.; Notes: (located in the "F" drive)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Telephone conversation with:; Notes: Left petitioner a message regarding the amended petition.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: Petitioner's document was rejected. More information needs to be provided in the content of the document, petitioner just submitted a cover page with what he is requesting.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed.; Notes: by petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: Pursuant to the filing of a Request to Waive Court Fees and Costs, and with good cause appearing therefor, IT IS ORDERED that appellate court fees and costs for the above-entitled action are waived pursuant to rule 8.26. This fee waiver applies only to the appellate fees and costs identified in California Rules of Court, rule 8.26(e) [appellate court filing fee; court fee for telephonic oral argument]. Any request for a waiver of superior court costs and fees must be addressed to the superior court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: By Petitioner Located in "F" drive sealed cabinet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: By petitioner Denise Thomas Petition attached with ADA requests Located in the "F" drive sealed active cabinet (720 pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Law Offices of Bokker T. Burney is a litigant

Latest cases where The Superior Court of Orange County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAYUK CHRISTOPHER WEBB