Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 06/14/2021 at 00:31:05 (UTC).

The State of California, Department of Transportation v. The Superior Court; Juan Castillo et al.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 The State of California, Department of Transportation filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court Juan Castillo. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ochoa, Gilbert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6630

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Courts Of Appeal

  • Courthouse:

    Fourth Appellate District - Division 2

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Ochoa, Gilbert

 

Party Details

Petitioner

The State of California, Department of Transportation

Respondent

The Superior Court of San Bernardino County

Interested Parties

Guadalupe Castillo

Daniel Flores

Kemira Water Sloutions, Inc.

Juan Miguel Castillo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Richard A. Capella

Attorney at CA Dept of Transportation Legal Division

100 South Main Street, Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Erin Elise Holbrook

Attorney at CA Dept of Transportation Legal Division

100 South Main Street, Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Germaine C. Ng

Attorney at CA Dept of Transportation Legal Division

100 South Main Street, Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Jerald Michael Montoya

Attorney at CA Dept of Transportation Legal Division

100 South Main Street, Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Theresia Katja Falter

Attorney at Asvar Law, PC

10940 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 2150

Los Angeles, CA 90024-3942

Christopher Arash Asvar

Attorney at Asvar Law, PC

10940 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 2150

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Scott B. Spriggs

Attorney at Kinkle, Rodiger and Spriggs, P.C.

3333 Fourteenth Street

Riverside, CA 92501

Ronald Rexlund Carlson

Attorney at Kinkle, Rodriger and Spriggs, P.C.

3333 Fourteenth Street

Riverside, CA 92501

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • HearingDescription: Written return filed.; Notes: by respondent or real party, separately or jointly, or election to stand on the informal opposition already submitted, per order of May 20, 2021 (schd petitioner's traverse 15 days)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case briefed and on assignment panel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Issued order to show cause.; Notes: Parties are ordered to show cause before this court why relief prayed for should not be granted. Respondent or real party in interest, separately or jointly, may file a formal return within 25 days of the date of this order or notify this court they elect to stand on the informal opposition already submitted. Petitioner shall file a traverse no later than 15 days thereafter. Parties will be notified when the matter is set for oral argument.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: opposition to petition by RPI's Castillo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: RPI's Guadalupe Castillo & Juan Castillo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition - opposition to petition; Notes: RPI's Guadalupe Castillo & Juan Castillo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: 4 volumes (1002 pages total)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Amended petition filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: petitioner; exhibits do not comply with rule 8.74(a)(5). If the supporting documents are not filed on or before 5 days from the date of this notice, the court may strike or summarily deny the petition.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Counsel for petitioner, requesting an amended proof of service to include counsel for real parties, who were not included on the TrueFiling service list

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: 4 vols exhibits in support of petition; -Each file must have a cover page stating the file number for that file, the total number of files for that document, the page numbers contained in that file. -Each file must be paginated consecutively across all files in the document, including the cover pages for each file.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: re petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF CALIFORNIA-DEPARTMENT OF PARKS is a litigant

Latest cases where The Superior Court of San Bernardino County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FALTER THERESIA K