This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/20/2022 at 12:35:08 (UTC).

The Roman Catholic Bishop of Orange v. Superior Court Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 The Roman Catholic Bishop of Orange filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 7 located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3939

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

The Roman Catholic Bishop of Orange

Respondents

Superior Court Los Angeles County

Hon. David S Cunningham

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party

Plaintiffs in cases coordinated in JCCP 5101

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Interested Party Attorneys

Tyler Zuckerman Bernstein

650 Town Center Dr, 10Th Floor

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-1993

Jason Andrew Weiss

650 Town Center Dr. Fl 4

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-1993

Elizabeth Susan Lachman

Attorney at McKool Smith Hennigan PC

300 S Grand Ave Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

James Michael Hennigan

Attorney at McKool Smith Hennigan, P.C.

300 South Grand Avenue Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Lee William Potts

Attorney at McKool Smith Hennigan, P.C.

300 S. Grand Ave. Ste 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Shehnaz Bhujwala

Attorney at Boucher LLP

21600 Oxnard Street Suite 600

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

John A. Montevideo

Attorney at Di Marco, Araujo & Montevideo

1324 North Broadway

Santa Ana, CA 92706

Sophia M. Achermann

Attorney at Fiore Achermann, A Law Corporation

340 Pine St Ste 503

San Francisco, CA 94104-3237

Justin Ryan Felton

Attorney at Herman Law

1800 N Military Trl, Ste 160

Boca Raton, FL 33431

John Scott Bonagofsky

Attorney at Bonagofsky & Weiss

111 Deerwood Rd., Ste 200

San Ramon, CA 94583-4445

Raymond P. Boucher

Attorney at Boucher LLP

21600 Oxnard Street Suite 600

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Terry Gross

Attorney at Gross & Belsky P.C

201 Spear Street, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94105

Alison M. Crane

Attorney at Bledsoe, Diestel, Treppa & Crane LLP

180 Sandsome Street, 5Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Anthony Christopher Modarelli, III

Attorney at DiMarco, Araujo & Montevideo

1324 N Broadway

Santa Ana, CA 92706-3903

Mary Blaise Parker

Attorney at Gross & Belsky P.C.

201 Spear St Ste 1100

San Francisco, CA 94105-6164

Wade A Davison

Attorney at Herman Law

1800 N Military Trl, Ste 160

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Dominique Leah Boubion

Attorney at Carrillo Law Firm LLP

1499 Huntington Dr Ste 402

South Pasadena, CA 91030

Adam Chaim Belsky

Attorney at Gross & Belsky P.C.

201 Spear Street, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94105

Blake Jarrod Woodhall

Attorney at Herman Law

1800 N Military Trl, Ste 160

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

53 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: The petition for a writ of certiorari in the above entitled case was filed on April 15, 2022 and placed on the docket April 25. 2022 as No. 21-1377.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Supreme Court order filed re:; Notes: Dear Clerk: The application for an extension of time within which to file a petition for a writ of certiorari in the above-entitled case has been presented to Justice Kagan, who on February 10, 2022, extend the time to and including April 16, 2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: The petition for review is denied. [S270849]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Supreme Court order filed re:; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in t4e above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including December 9, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied. [S270849]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: REPLY TO ANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF REVIEW OR,IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR, GRANT AND TRANSFER, OR OTHER APPROPRIATE RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of Supreme Court filing.; Notes: Answer to petition for review.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record transmitted to Supreme Court electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Petitioner The Roman Catholic Bishop of Orange

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed on August 2, 2021, as well as the opposition filed on August 26, 2021. The petition is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Real Parties in Interest.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of prohibition filed on August 2, 2021 has been read and considered. The real parties in interest are requested to serve and file a preliminary opposition by August 26, 2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Proof of Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volumes 7 of 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Prohibition.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOOP OF ORANGE is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOUBION DOMINIQUE LEAH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam Chaim Belsky