This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/06/2022 at 23:51:34 (UTC).

The Roman Catholic Bishop of Oakland et al. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 The Roman Catholic Bishop of Oakland filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 8 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Smith, Winifred. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3278

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Smith, Winifred

 

Party Details

Petitioners

The Roman Catholic Bishop of Oakland

The Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento

The Roman Catholic Archbishop of San Fransciso

The Roman Catholic Bishop of San Jose

The Roman Catholic Bishop of Monterey, California

The Roman Catholic Bishop of Santa Rosa

The Roman Catholic Bishop of Fresno

Respondent

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Parties

John Doe

Jane Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Interested Party Attorneys

Jeffrey Robert Blease

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

555 Calfiornia St. - #1700

San Francisco, CA 94104

Stephen J. Greene, Jr.

Attorney at Greene & Roberts LLP

455 Capitol Mall Ste 405

Sacramento, CA 95814-4429

Paul Edward Gaspari

Attorney at Weintraub Tobin

475 Sansome St., Suite 510

San Francisco, CA 94111

Daniel C. Zamora

Attorney at Weintraub Tobin Chediak Coleman Grodin

475 Sansome St., Ste 510

San Francisco, CA 94111-3141

Adrienne M. Moran

Attorney at Shapiro Galvin Shapiro & Moran

Po Box 5589

Santa Rosa, CA 95402

Mart Benjamin Oller, IV

Attorney at McCormick Barstow et al LLP

7647 North Fresno Street

Fresno, CA 93720

Anne Andrews

Attorney at Andrews & Thornton

4701 Von Karman Avenue, Suite 300

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Lauren Rae Davis

Attorney at Andrews & Thornton

4701 Von Karman Ave Ste 300

Newport Beach, CA 92660-2193

John Thornton

Attorney at Andrew & Thornton

4701 Von Karman Avenue, Suite 300

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Mike Arias

Attorney at Arias Sanguinetti Stahle & Torrijos LLP

6701 Center Drive West Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90045-1558

Brendan Matthew Kunkle

Attorney at Abbey Weitzenberg Warren & Emery PC

100 Stony Point Rd #200 P O Box 1566

Santa Rosa, CA 95402-1566

John McCanne Sanford

Attorney at Abbey Weitzenberg Warren Emery

100 Stony Point Road, Suite 200

Santa Rosa, CA 95401-1566

Peter Oscar Glaessner

Attorney at Allen, Glaessner, Hazelwood & Werth, LLP

180 Montgomery St Ste 1200

San Francisco, CA 94104

Oren Givol

Attorney at Andrews & Thornton

4701 Von Karman Avenue, Suite 300

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Sean T. Higgins

Attorney at Andrews & Thornton

4701 Von Karman Ave Ste 300

Newport Beach, CA 92660-2193

Ryan M. McIntosh

Attorney at Andrews & Thornton, ALC

4701 Von Karman Ave Ste 300

Newport Beach, CA 92660-2193

Robert S. Siko

Attorney at Andrews & Thornton

4701 Von Karman Ave Ste 300

Newport Beach, CA 92660-2193

Respondent Attorneys

Presiding Judge

Los Angeles Superior Court 111 N. Hill St., Dept. 1

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Hon. Winifred Yo. Smith

Attorney at Superior Court-Alameda

1221 Oak St Dept 23

Oakland, CA 94612

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

79 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: The petition for review and application for stay are denied. [S271532]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review received.; Notes: Real parties in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ of Review Attorneys for Plaintiffs and Real Parties in Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: S271532 - In the Supreme Court of California THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF OAKLAND; THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF SACRAMENTO; THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF SAN FRANCISCO; THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF SAN JOSE, THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF MONTEREY, and THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF SANTA ROSA Attorneys for Defendants and Petitioners,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed additional cites.; Notes: By Attorneys for Petitioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Petition for Writ of Mandate, Real Party of interest preliminary opposition, reply to preliminary opposition.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Reply and RJN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.; Notes: In support of reply to opposition

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition - opposition to petition; Notes: REAL PARTY IN INTERESTS' PRELIMINARY OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND/OR PROHIBITION OR OTHER APPROPRIATE RELIEF AND OPPOSITION TO REQUEST FOR IMMEDIATE STAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF REAL PARTY IN INTERESTS' PRELIMINARY OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND/OR PROHIBITION OR OTHER APPROPRIATE RELIEF [VOLUME 1 OF 1 - PAGES 1 - 303]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Mandate - Vol 5 of 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Mandate - Vol 4 of 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Mandate - Vol 3 of 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Mandate - Vol 2 of 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Mandate - Vol 1 of 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate (Stay Requested)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Roman Catholic Bishop of Monterey, California is a litigant

Latest cases where THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF SACRAMENTO is a litigant

Latest cases where THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF SAN FRANCISCO, A RELIGIOUS CORPORATION SOLE is a litigant