This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/26/2022 at 01:21:03 (UTC).

The People v. Yamamoto

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Yamamoto. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Camarena, Enrique. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9669

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Camarena, Enrique

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Earle Daniel Yamamoto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Ksenia D. Gracheva

Attorney at CA Attorney General

600 W. Broadway, Ste. 1800

San Diego, CA 92101

Office of the Attorney General

P. O. Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92186-5266

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

David W. Beaudreau

Attorney at Law Office of David W. Beaudreau

748 South Meadows Parkway, Suite A9-182

Reno, NV 89521

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2022
  • HearingDescription: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF. Due on 07/05/2022 By 32 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Change of contact information filed for:; Notes: Counsel for respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Earle Daniel Yamamoto Attorney: David W. Beaudreau

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketBrief: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF.; Due Date: 07/05/2022; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: The PeopleAttorney: Office of the Attorney General

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketBrief: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Earle Daniel YamamotoAttorney: David W. Beaudreau

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: No further extensions are contemplated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Augmented record filed.; Notes: CT-1 (24 pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Change of contact information filed for:; Notes: Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Augmentation granted. (See order.); Notes: Appellant's request to augment the record on appeal is GRANTED. The Clerk of the San Diego County Superior Court is directed to prepare and transmit to this court a supplemental transcript as outlined in the attached request. Copies of the augmentation shall be furnished to counsel of record. The supplemental transcript is due 30 days from the date of this order. Appellant's opening brief is due 30 days after the augmented record is filed with this court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion/application to augment record filed.; Notes: Appellant -- with EOT request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Probation report filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.************; Notes: Clerk's Transcript - 1 (282 pgs.), Reporter's Transcripts - 10 (857 pgs.), Preliminary Hearing - 1 (46 pgs.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: David W. Beaudreau for appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: Filed November 2, 2021 - Yamamoto

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: SCS310830; Trial Court Judge: Camarena, Enrique

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David W. Beaudreau