This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/05/2023 at 02:33:14 (UTC).

The People v. W.M. et al.

Case Summary

On 09/12/2022 The People filed an Other lawsuit against W M. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Davis, Terrye. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6116

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Davis, Terrye

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People

Not Yet Classified and Appellants

City of Vallejo

The Association of Southern California Defense Counsel

California State Association of Counties

Defendant and Respondent

W. M.

Amicus Curiae

First District Appellate Project

Interested Parties

K. M.

County of Solano

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Office of District Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

Not Yet Classified and Appellant Attorneys

Matthew Christopher Slentz

Andrew Courtland Rawcliffe

Veronica Ann Franz Nebb

Randy Joel Risner

Michael G. Colantuono

Katelyn M. Knight

Benjamin G. Shatz

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

Solano County Alternate Public Defender

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

J. Bradley O'Connell

First District Appellate Project

Interested Party Attorneys

Patrick M. Buelna

Melissa C. Nold

Bernadette S. Curry

 

Court Documents

A166116

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2023
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.; Notes: S279584

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of Supreme Court filing.; Notes: Request for publication filed (initial case entry)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order denying publication filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT: Since this court's March 29, 2023, opinion does not meet the standard for publication as set forth in rule 8.1105(c) of the California Rules of Court, the request for publication is denied. Pursuant to rule 8.1120(b) of the California Rules of Court, the Clerk is directed to forward to the Clerk of the Supreme Court the request for publication, the opinion, and a copy of this order.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed request to publish opinion.; Notes: The Association of Southern California Defense Counsel and California State Association of Counties by Benjamin Shatz of Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Remanded to trial court with directions; Disposition Type: Final The juvenile court's order is reversed. The cause is remanded with instructions to the court to determine whether the City has presented good cause for accessing W.M.'s juvenile case file, and if so, to conduct an in camera review of the case file to determine whether documents relevant to the issues raised in the City's section 827 petition exist. If such documents exist, the court must balance the interests of W.M., the City, and the public to determine whether such documents should be disclosed and the appropriate scope of any such disclosure.; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Rodriguez, Victor A.; Participants: Petrou, Ioana (Concur) Tucher, Alison M. (Concur)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) The juvenile court's order is reversed. The cause is remanded with instructions to the court to determine whether the City has presented good cause for accessing W.M.'s juvenile case file, and if so, to conduct an in camera review of the case file to determine whether documents relevant to the issues raised in the City's section 827 petition exist. If such documents exist, the court must balance the interests of W.M., the City, and the public to determine whether such documents should be disclosed and the appropriate scope of any such disclosure.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.; Notes: J. Bradley O'Connell for amicus and Matthew Slentz for RPI.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: After tentative opinion by amicus

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Issued tentative opinion or disputed issued memo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: NOTICE OF TENTATIVE OPINION A166116 - In re W.M. This case is scheduled for oral argument on the court's March 29, 2023 calendar. The court is distributing the attached tentative opinion to the parties before the argument. The court believes the record and briefs satisfactorily present the facts and the controlling legal authority, and it is prepared to rule along the lines set forth in the tentative opinion. If a party that requested argument previously notifies the court, opposing counsel, and any unrepresented parties in writing by noon on Monday, March 13, 2023, that they still wish to proceed with oral argument, oral argument will take place as scheduled and the views expressed in the tentative opinion will be subject to change. If no such notification is given, oral argument will not be held, and the court's final opinion will reflect the substance of the tentative opinion. Very truly yours, Charles D. Johnson Clerk/Administrator By: _____________, Deputy Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: RESPONSE OF AMICUS CURIAE FIRST DISTRICT APPELLATE PROJECT TO MOTION TO EXPEDITE BRIEFING AND FOR CALENDAR PREFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: J. Bradley O'Connell for Amicus Curiae Brief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The court has reviewed the record that has been filed and is concerned that there appears to be no party who will represent the interests of respondent or, more generally, of individuals who have had cases in the juvenile justice system. The court views this case as potentially significant, and it wants to ensure that all relevant issues are vetted fully. Therefore, the court orders the First District Appellate Project (FDAP) to select and recommend appropriate counsel who can assist the court as amicus curiae. (Cf. United States v. Windsor (2013) 570 U.S. 744, 755.) Appellant the City of Vallejo has filed a motion for calendar preference. Opposition to that motion is currently due on or before November 1, 2022. The court now extends that deadline to November 14, 2022, and asks FDAP to take whatever steps are necessary to appoint counsel who can meet that extended deadline.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: Letter from FDAP regarding discretionary appointment for minor.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Motion to expedite briefing and for calendar prference; memorandum in support; declaration of Andrew C. Rawcliffe; and proposed order.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Record Filed AOB Due in 40 Days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: do not provide this record to anyone

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: Civil Case Information Statement in a Juvenile Criminal Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: Filed on 9/12/22 by City of Vallejo seeking minor W.M.'s records

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Solano County Superior Court - Main; County: Solano; Trial Court Case Number: J40937; Trial Court Judge: Davis, Terrye

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less