This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/11/2023 at 08:07:49 (UTC).

The People v. W.M. et al.

Case Summary

On 09/12/2022 The People filed an Other lawsuit against W M. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Davis, Terrye. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6116

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Davis, Terrye

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People

Not Yet Classified and Appellant

City of Vallejo

Respondent and Defendant

W. M.

Amicus Curiae

First District Appellate Project

Oakland, CA 94612

Interested Parties

K. M.

County of Solano

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue - Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

Office of District Attorney

Hall Of Justice 675 Texas Street 4Th Floor

Fairfield, CA 94533

Not Yet Classified and Appellant Attorneys

Andrew Courtland Rawcliffe

Attorney at Colantuono Highsmith Whatley PC

790 E. Colorado Blvd., Suite 850

Pasadena, CA 91101

Matthew Christopher Slentz

Attorney at Colantuono, Highsmith & Whatley, PC

420 Sierra College Drive, Suite 140

Grass Valley, CA 95945

Veronica Ann Franz Nebb

Attorney at City Attorney, City of Vallejo

555 Santa Clara St

Vallejo, CA 94590

Randy Joel Risner

Attorney at City Attorney's Office/City of Vallejo

555 Santa Clara St

Vallejo, CA 94590-5922

Michael G. Colantuono

Attorney at Colantuono Highsmith & Whatley PC

420 Sierra College Drive - Suite 140

Grass Valley, CA 95945

Katelyn M. Knight

Attorney at Assistant City Attorney

555 Santa Clara Street,

Vallejo, CA 94590

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Solano County Alternate Public Defender

675 Texas Street, Suite 3500

Fairfield, CA 94533-6339

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

J. Bradley O'Connell

Attorney at First District Appellate Project

1212 Broadway, Suite 1200

Oakland, CA 94612

First District Appellate Project

Attorney at First District Appellate Project

1212 Broadway, Suite 1200

Oakland, CA 94612

Interested Party Attorneys

Melissa C. Nold

Attorney at Nold Law

521 Georgia Street

Vallejo, CA 94590-6006

Patrick M. Buelna

Attorney at Pointer & Buelna, LLP

155 Filbert Street, Suite 208

Oakland, CA 94607

Bernadette S. Curry

Attorney at Office of the Solano County Counsel

675 Texas Street, Suite 6600

Fairfield, CA 94533-6301

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: After tentative opinion by amicus

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Issued tentative opinion or disputed issued memo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: NOTICE OF TENTATIVE OPINION A166116 - In re W.M. This case is scheduled for oral argument on the court's March 29, 2023 calendar. The court is distributing the attached tentative opinion to the parties before the argument. The court believes the record and briefs satisfactorily present the facts and the controlling legal authority, and it is prepared to rule along the lines set forth in the tentative opinion. If a party that requested argument previously notifies the court, opposing counsel, and any unrepresented parties in writing by noon on Monday, March 13, 2023, that they still wish to proceed with oral argument, oral argument will take place as scheduled and the views expressed in the tentative opinion will be subject to change. If no such notification is given, oral argument will not be held, and the court's final opinion will reflect the substance of the tentative opinion. Very truly yours, Charles D. Johnson Clerk/Administrator By: _____________, Deputy Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Matthew Slentz on behalf of Vallejo (PA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent. Calendar date:; Notes: March 29, 2023, at 9:30 am. 10 minutes per side.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record to court for review.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case on conference list.; Notes: 23-2.1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: Change of contact information filed for:; Notes: J. Bradley O'Connell old address 1: 475 - 14th Street, Suite 650 new address 1: 1212 Broadway, Suite 1200

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: Change of contact information filed for:; Notes: First District Appellate Project old address 1: 475 Fourteenth Street, Suite 650 new address 1: 1212 Broadway, Suite 1200

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: To Cities request for judicial notice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: RESPONSE OF AMICUS CURIAE FIRST DISTRICT APPELLATE PROJECT TO MOTION TO EXPEDITE BRIEFING AND FOR CALENDAR PREFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: J. Bradley O'Connell for Amicus Curiae Brief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The court has reviewed the record that has been filed and is concerned that there appears to be no party who will represent the interests of respondent or, more generally, of individuals who have had cases in the juvenile justice system. The court views this case as potentially significant, and it wants to ensure that all relevant issues are vetted fully. Therefore, the court orders the First District Appellate Project (FDAP) to select and recommend appropriate counsel who can assist the court as amicus curiae. (Cf. United States v. Windsor (2013) 570 U.S. 744, 755.) Appellant the City of Vallejo has filed a motion for calendar preference. Opposition to that motion is currently due on or before November 1, 2022. The court now extends that deadline to November 14, 2022, and asks FDAP to take whatever steps are necessary to appoint counsel who can meet that extended deadline.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: Letter from FDAP regarding discretionary appointment for minor.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Motion to expedite briefing and for calendar prference; memorandum in support; declaration of Andrew C. Rawcliffe; and proposed order.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Record Filed AOB Due in 40 Days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: do not provide this record to anyone

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: Civil Case Information Statement in a Juvenile Criminal Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: Filed on 9/12/22 by City of Vallejo seeking minor W.M.'s records

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Solano County Superior Court - Main; County: Solano; Trial Court Case Number: J40937; Trial Court Judge: Davis, Terrye

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less