This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 03/12/2021 at 12:01:04 (UTC).

The People v. Whicker

Case Summary

On 09/03/2020 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Whicker. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mitchell, Daviann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7526

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mitchell, Daviann

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Stacey Jerome Whicker

Lancaster, CA 93539-8457

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring St. 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Gary A. Lieberman

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring Steet, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

California Appellate Project

520 S. Grand Avenue 4Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Thomas Owen

Attorney at Coronado Law Group

P.O. Box 1608

Burlingame, CA 94011-1608

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's reply brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: The People Attorney: Gary A. Lieberman Two extensions granted for a total of 92 days: 12/14/2020 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 02/16/2021 By 62 Day(s) 12/15/2020 Granted - extension of time. Due on 02/16/2021 By 62 Day(s) 02/16/2021 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 03/18/2021 By 30 Day(s) 02/18/2021 Granted - extension of time. Due on 03/18/2021 By 30 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Due Date: 03/22/2021; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Stacey Jerome WhickerAttorney: Thomas Owen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: The PeopleAttorney: Gary A. Lieberman; Notes: Two extensions granted for a total of 92 days: 12/14/2020 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 02/16/2021 By 62 Day(s) 12/15/2020 Granted - extension of time. Due on 02/16/2021 By 62 Day(s) 02/16/2021 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 03/18/2021 By 30 Day(s) 02/18/2021 Granted - extension of time. Due on 03/18/2021 By 30 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned.; Notes: Counsel appointment order issued October 23, 2020, returned. A copy of the counsel appointment order was resent to Appellant Whicker on November 25, 2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice granted.; Notes: Appellant's request for judicial notice is granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.; Notes: Appellant's request for judicial notice (with attachment)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Stacey Jerome Whicker Attorney: Thomas Owen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Stacey Jerome WhickerAttorney: Thomas Owen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Thomas Owen for Appellant Whicker.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-1 (79 Pages) R-1, ONE: Marsden Proceeding dated April 16, 2014. PR-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: 09/03/2020 Stacey Jerome Whicker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: MA058071; Trial Court Judge: Mitchell, Daviann

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary A. Lieberman