This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/23/2021 at 14:05:22 (UTC).

The People v. Ventura County Superior Court **PEOPLE'S WRIT**

Case Summary

On 10/08/2021 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Ventura County Superior Court PEOPLE'S WRIT. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Worley, David. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5561

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Worley, David

 

Party Details

Petitioner

The People

Respondent

Ventura County Superior Court

Hon. David Worley 800 Victoria St.

Ventura, CA 93009

Interested Party

Christopher Patrick Welch

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Office of the District Attorney

800 South Victoria Avenue 3Rd Floor Hoj

Ventura, CA 93009

Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring St. 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Interested Party Attorney

Mark Richard Pachowicz

Attorney at Pachowicz Goldenring

6050 Seahawk Street

Ventura, CA 93003-6622

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final GYT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: On October 8, 2021, the People filed this petition for a writ of mandate and request for stay challenging the "pre-preliminary hearing order" of September 28, 2021, granting discovery. Petitioner is challenging a ruling of the magistrate. Accordingly, the petition is denied without prejudice to petitioner's right to seek relief in the superior court. (See, e.g., People v. Superior Court (Jimenez) (2002) 28 Cal.4th 798, 803-804; Magallan v. Superior Court (2011) 192 Cal.App.4th 1444, 1453 ["superior court is the court with jurisdiction to review the actions of a magistrate and issue a writ of mandate to a magistrate"]; Cal. Const., art. 6, 10.) [GYT]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Vol. 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Vol. 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: People's Writ of Mandate; Stay Requested Current Compliance Date October 11, 2022 Hearing Date October 15, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Ventura County Superior Court - Main (Ventura); County: Ventura; Trial Court Case Number: 2019013095; Trial Court Judge: Worley, David

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VENTURA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT/ is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PACHOWICZ, MARK