This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/13/2021 at 03:07:19 (UTC).

The People v. Thomas

Case Summary

On 07/08/2020 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Thomas. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cuellar, Jr., Armando. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0532

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Cuellar, Jr., Armando

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

James Thomas

Dublin, CA 94568

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue - Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

First District Appellate Project

Attorney at First District Appellate Project

475 Fourteenth Street, Suite 650

Oakland, CA 94612

Peter F. Goldscheider

600 Allerton Street, Suite 201

Redwood City, CA 94063

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2020
  • HearingDescription: Filed augmented record pursuant to rule 8.340.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Notice rescinding 11/25/2020 letter to counsel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Dated 12/9/2020 by attorney Peter Goldscheider re: augmentation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record omission letter received.; Notes: Dated 12/9/2020; Second Amended Request for [Augmentation] of the Record by attorney Peter Goldscheider for appellant to Alameda Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising that augmented record has been filed.; Notes: to all counsel; aob due 12/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed augmented record pursuant to rule 8.340.; Notes: r-6; 8/17/2016, 8/4/2017, 5/22/2020, 6/29/2020, 6/30/2020, 7/7/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed augmented record pursuant to rule 8.340.; Notes: c-1 [confidential]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed augmented record pursuant to rule 8.340.; Notes: c-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: Court Reporter Response to Notice of Appeal in Lieu of Transcript; Filed in Alameda Superior Court 11/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: Marsden transcript sent.; Notes: To appellant's counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record omission letter received.; Notes: Dated 11/4/2020 by attorney Peter Goldscheider for appellant to Alameda Superior Court: amended request for augmentation of the record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record omission letter received.; Notes: Dated 10/29/2020 by attorney Peter Goldscheider for appellant to Alameda County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 11/02/2020 By 20 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 11/02/2020 By 20 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Record filed today. AOB due in 40 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Probation report filed.; Notes: pages 825-856

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: CT-4, RT-8 SEALED: v4 pages 322-327, v6 pages 862-868 and v8 pages 1069-1083

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Attorney Peter Goldscheider for appellant Thomas (Independent/40)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; County: Alameda; Trial Court Case Number: 613342; Trial Court Judge: Cuellar, Jr., Armando

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant