This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/12/2022 at 16:04:04 (UTC).

The People v. The Superior Court of San Diego County/Shanley et al.

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 The People filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of San Diego County/Shanley. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kelety, Julia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0393

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Kelety, Julia

 

Party Details

Petitioner

The People

Respondent

The Superior Court of San Diego County

Interested Parties

Imara Shanley

Jennifer Bazzo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Steven Kenne Hansen

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

1200 3Rd Ave., Ste. 700

San Diego, CA 92101-4106

Interested Party Attorney

Coleen M. Cusack

110 W C St., Ste. 1200

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2023
  • HearingDescription: Record sent to storage.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition for writ of mandate has been read and considered by Justices Haller, Irion, and Do. The petition is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate has been read and considered by Justices Haller, Irion, and Do. The petition is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Corrected petition for writ of mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Superior Court of San Diego County is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Coleen M. Cusack